Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Kohler et al
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Thomas Kohler and Diane Kimseu Kohler
Case Number: 4:2011cv00439
Filed: January 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation REGARDING WAIVER OF RESPECTIVE RIGHTS TO APPEAL AND TO MOVE FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND NONTAXABLE COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Motions due by 11/28/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 35 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 45 MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF ANDREW KLIMENKO. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ADR SESSION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation RE DEPOSIT OF DISPUTED FUNDS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 12 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 17 MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Kohler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Schuller
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kohler
Represented By: Andrew Martin Klimenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Kimseu Kohler
Represented By: Andrew Martin Klimenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?