Clerkin et al v. Mylife.com Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Clerkin and Veronica Mendez
Defendant: Mylife.com Inc., Jeffrey Tinsley, Rachel Glaser, W. Dwight Gorall, Armen Avedissian, Michael Soh, Sharyn Eles and Oak Investment Partners
Case Number: 4:2011cv00527
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 147 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Mylife.com Inc., Veronica Mendez, John Clerkin. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/04/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
May 8, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 141 STIPULATION For a Revision to Document Production Schedule and Setting Forth Class Certification Briefing Schedule Pursuant to the Court's May 4, 2012 Order. Motions due by 9/28/2012. Response/Cross Motions due by 11/9/2012 .Replies due by 12/14/2012. Replies due by 12/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/8/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
April 2, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 110 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 28, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 108 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY, TAKING 110 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO WITHDRAW UNDER SUBMISSION, AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 14, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 112 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motions due by 6/11/2012. Cross Motions due by 8/13/2012. Responses due by 8/13/2012. Replies due by 10/15/2012. Replies due by 10/22/2012. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
February 1, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 95 . The motion will be determined based on the papers. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/1/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 12, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE for Discovery purposesre 95 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/12/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 5, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 91 MOTION to Enlarge Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3. Motions due by 4/11/2012. Responses due by 6/10/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claidia Wilken on 1/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 15, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER DENYING 84 MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
August 29, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT OAK INVESTMENT PARTNERS 69 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING DEFENDANTS JOINT 70 MOTION TO DISMISS AND 73 MOTION TO STRIKE. Responses due by 3/15/2012. Replies due by 5/17/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 16, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 79 GRANTING DEFENDANT GORALLS RULE 12(B)(2) 39 MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS RULE 12(B)(6) 42 MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 47 MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. **CASE NO. CORRECTED ON PAGE 18 IS THE ONLY CHANGE (HIGHLIGHTED ON ORDER)**. ***CONSOLIDATING CASES C-11-2353-CW and C-11-3073-CW. ALL FUTURE FILING SHALL BE FILED IN THIS CASE C-11-527-CW*** Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANT GORALLS RULE 12(B)(2) 39 MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS RULE 12(B)(6) 42 MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 47 MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 2, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 1, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RELATING CASES AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER in case 4:11-cv-00527-CW and 3:11-cv-3073-MEJ Re (75 in 4:11-cv-00527-CW, 14 in 4:11-cv-02353-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER in case 4:11-cv-00527-CW and 3:11-cv-3073-MEJ. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
May 27, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 60 Stipulation to Change the Time of the June 9, 2011 Hearing From 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
April 5, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY ONE WEEK UNTIL APRIL 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 28, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS 25 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clerkin et al v. Mylife.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clerkin
Represented By: Joseph I. Marchese
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Mendez
Represented By: Joseph I. Marchese
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylife.com Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tinsley
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Glaser
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Dwight Gorall
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armen Avedissian
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Soh
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharyn Eles
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Investment Partners
Represented By: Sameer Dhond
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?