Miller et al v. City of Menlo Park et al
Plaintiff: Chester Miller, Betty Miller and Plaintiffs
Defendant: City of Menlo Park, Ray Samuels and Jeremy Foy
Case Number: 4:2011cv00543
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON MOTIONS 42 , 51 IN LIMINE AND EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 Proposed Order, filed by City of Menlo Park, Jeremy Foy, Matthew Ortega, Cristela Solorzano, Scott Mackdanz, Ron Venzon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/12/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation REGARDING PLAINTIFFS VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN COUNTS IN THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION AND DISMISSAL OF THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/30/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/13/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. City of Menlo Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Miller
Represented By: Gayla B. Libet
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Miller
Represented By: Gayla B. Libet
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Menlo Park
Represented By: John L. Flegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Samuels
Represented By: John L. Flegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Foy
Represented By: John L. Flegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?