Skaff et al v. Safari West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Skaff and Connie Arnold
Defendant: Nancy Anne Lang, Safari West, Inc. and Peter Anton Lang
Case Number: 4:2011cv00869
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/10/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING initial case management conference to May 2, 2013. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/25/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING the initial case management conference. The initial case management conference that is set for March 28, 2013 is CONTINUED to April 25, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Ave nue, San Francisco, California. The parties shall submit a joint case management conference statement no later than April 18, 2013. If the parties reach an agreement to settle all of Plaintiffs claims, they shall promptly notify the court so the in itial case management conference can be vacated. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/21/2013. (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER regarding the parties' January 18, 2013 status update and SETTING an initial case management conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/24/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER regarding the parties' November 26, 2012 status update. The court orders the parties to submit another status update no later than January 18, 2012 that describes the current status of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/28/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER regarding the parties' October 10, 2012 Status Update. The court will not set an initial case management conference at this time. Instead, the court ORDERS the parties to submit another status update no later than November 12, 2012, describing the current status of the case. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/10/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/16/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATES FOR 60 DAYS to August 5, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/1/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skaff et al v. Safari West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Anne Lang
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safari West, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Anton Lang
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Skaff
Represented By: Jeffrey A Harrison
Represented By: Patricia Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Represented By: Jeffrey A Harrison
Represented By: Patricia Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?