Howl v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Howl
Defendant: Recontrust, N.A., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, PRLAP, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00887
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: Defendants' Settlement Conference Statement. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/16/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference from 10/21/2011 to 11/21/2011 re 52 . Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/20/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2011: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 20 MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/17/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howl v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust, N.A.
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLAP, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Howl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?