Quitiquit et al v. Robinson Rancheria Citizens Business Council et al
Plaintiff: Luwana Quitiquit, Robert Quitiquit, Karen Ramos, Inez Sands and Rueben Want
Defendant: Michelle Monlo, Kim Fernandez, Robinson Rancheria Citizens Business Council, Tracey Avila, Curtis Anderson, Jr., Stoney Timmons and Nicholas Medina
Case Number: 4:2011cv00983
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 31 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TRO re 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Inez Sands, Rueben Want, Robert Quitiquit, Karen Ramos, Luwana Quitiquit. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/3/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quitiquit et al v. Robinson Rancheria Citizens Business Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Monlo
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Fernandez
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Rancheria Citizens Business Council
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Avila
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoney Timmons
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Medina
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luwana Quitiquit
Represented By: Julie Aguilar Rogado
Represented By: Rau Mona Tawatao
Represented By: Angelica Maria Millan
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Quitiquit
Represented By: Julie Aguilar Rogado
Represented By: Rau Mona Tawatao
Represented By: Angelica Maria Millan
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ramos
Represented By: Julie Aguilar Rogado
Represented By: Rau Mona Tawatao
Represented By: Angelica Maria Millan
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Sands
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hansen
Represented By: Angelica Maria Millan
Represented By: Julie Aguilar Rogado
Represented By: Rau Mona Tawatao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rueben Want
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hansen
Represented By: Angelica Maria Millan
Represented By: Julie Aguilar Rogado
Represented By: Rau Mona Tawatao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?