MasterObjects, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: MasterObjects, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01054
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 162 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 164 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/24/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 140 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Claim construction order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/28/13. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 130 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler Re: 106 Discovery Letter Brief. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Beeler denying Google's request to modify the model protective order [ 98 Discovery Letter Brief] (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton Granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY LETTERS: Discovery Hearing reset to 1/19/2012 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/21/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 58 Stipulation, filed by MasterObjects, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 33 Stipulation filed by Google, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 24 Stipulation, filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Stipulation, filed by Google, Inc. NO HEARING WILL BE HELD. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MasterObjects, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MasterObjects, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Bishop
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: William Patrick Nelson
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?