Emblaze Ltd. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Emblaze Ltd.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01079
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2015 Filing 679 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 678 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. Filing fee $ 505. Appeal Record due by 5/11/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 Remark - acknowledgment of receipt from - Office of the Clerk United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 678 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 677 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Emblaze Ltd.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9425465. Appeal Record due by 5/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTIONS SEEKING REVIEW OF CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 657 ; granting-in-part 658 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 676 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/09/2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 674 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2015. (Related documents(s) 674 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 675 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 673 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 672 Amended Notice of Appeal,. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 4/3/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Appeal Remark - receipt of acknowledgment from the Federal Circuit re 672 Amended Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 672 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Apple Inc. as to 610 Judgment, 667 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct 605 609 . Appeal Record due by 4/1/2015. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 671 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 670 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. Appeal Record due by 3/27/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 670 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 610 Judgment, 169 Order, 667 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 653 Order, 424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Emblaze Ltd.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-9314515. Appeal Record due by 3/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2015) Modified on 3/2/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/10/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2015 Filing 669 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Appeal of Judgment 610 , Jury Verdict 609 , Order 169 , Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 667 , Order 653 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct 424 , 214 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9314515 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2015) Modified text on 2/25/2015, correction to 668 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/10/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2015 Filing 668 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please ignore NOTICE of appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit by Emblaze Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2015) Modified on 2/25/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/25/2015,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/10/2015,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2015 Appeal Remark - receipt of acknowledgment from the ClerkUnited States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND FOR NEW TRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 630 ; denying 631 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
December 9, 2014 Filing 666 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2014 re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial, 657 MOTION Seeking Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs and 658 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs: The court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Martin Pavane & Lisa Ferrari. Also present: Naftali Shani. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Mark Fowler, Erin Gibson, Robert Buergi, Robert Williams & Krista Celentano. Also present: Ryan Moran & David Melaugh. This is a text only Minute Entry (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT THE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 664 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 664 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT THE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Text modified on 12/5/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2014 Filing 663 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Time On December 9, 2014 Motion Hearing, resetting time as to ECF No. 630 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, ECF No. 631 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial, ECF No. 657 Motion Seeking Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs & ECF No. 658 Motion For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs. 12/9/2014 10:00 AM Motion Hearing is reset to 1:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 662 REPLY (re 658 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed ) filed byApple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 661 REPLY (re 657 MOTION Seeking Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 660 RESPONSE (re 657 MOTION Seeking Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed ) filed byApple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 659 RESPONSE (re 658 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 658 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/31/2014. Replies due by 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 657 MOTION Seeking Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re 655 Costs Taxed filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/31/2014. Replies due by 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 656 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motions, rescheduling 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial. Motions set for 12/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 655 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 73,108.83 against Plaintiff Emblaze Ltd. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 654 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING OCTOBER 21, 2014 MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT: Due to the court's unavailability, 10/21/2014 Motions for Judgment (In Re: Docket Nos. 630 & 631 ) are hereby vacated. Matters to be rescheduled. Counsel also notified via email. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 653 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re 169 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 9, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT THE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 650 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 651 NOTICE by Emblaze Ltd. Emblaze Ltd.'s Notice of Name Change and Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 650 MOTION Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Use of Audio Visual Equipment in Courtroom at Hearing on Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/20/2014. Replies due by 10/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER GRANTING ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 21, 2014 AT 10:00 AM by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 648 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 648 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Adjournment of Hearing on Post-Trial Motions to October 21, 2014 at 10:00 A.M. filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 647 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, continuing 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial: 9/30/2014 Motions are continued to 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT THE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 645 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 645 MOTION Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Use of Audio Visual Equipment in Courtroom at the Hearing on Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 644 OBJECTIONS to re 635 Bill of Costs, Plaintiff Emblaze Ltd.'s Objections to Apple's Amended Bill of Costs by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 643 REPLY (re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit I)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 642 REPLY (re 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 641 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 640 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice of Lodging of Certain Trial Graphics Related Invoices for In Camera Review (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO LODGE CERTAIN TRIAL GRAPHICS-RELATED INVOICES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 638 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 639 NOTICE by Emblaze Ltd. Notice of Intent to Respond to Apple's Amended Bill of Costs (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 638 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to Lodge Certain Trial Graphics Related Invoices for In Camera Review filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2014. Replies due by 9/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 637 RESPONSE (re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Nemiroff, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 636 RESPONSE (re 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 635 AMENDED BILL OF COSTS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit I)(Gibson, Erin)amendment to 623 (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/22/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 634 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 632 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Filing fee $ 505. Appeal Record due by 9/15/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Acknowledgment of receipt re appeal 632 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 633 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 623 Bill of Costs, Apple's Notice of Intent to Waive Certain Costs From its Bill of Costs (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 632 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-8836174. Appeal Record due by 9/10/2014. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Alternative Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.59 For A New Trial filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2014. Replies due by 8/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to Ferrari Dec., # 3 Exhibit B to Ferrari Dec., # 4 Exhibit C to Ferrari Dec., # 5 Exhibit D to Ferrari Dec., # 6 Exhibit E to Ferrari Dec., # 7 Exhibit F to Ferrari Dec., # 8 Exhibit G to Ferrari Dec., # 9 Exhibit H to Ferrari Dec., # 10 Exhibit I to Ferrari Dec., # 11 Exhibit J to Ferrari Dec., # 12 Exhibit K to Ferrari Dec., # 13 Exhibit L to Ferrari Dec., # 14 Exhibit M to Ferrari Dec., # 15 Exhibit N to Ferrari Dec., # 16 Exhibit O to Ferrari Dec., # 17 Exhibit P to Ferrari Dec., # 18 Exhibit Q to Ferrari Dec., # 19 Exhibit R to Ferrari Dec., # 20 Proposed Order)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2014. Replies due by 8/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A to Gibson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Gibson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Gibson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Gibson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Gibson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Gibson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Gibson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Gibson Declaration, # 10 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 629 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY #628 Brief (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 628 *** CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY *** Brief Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(b) For Judgment As A Matter of Law or, In The Alternative, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 MOTION For a New Trial filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to Ferrari Dec., # 3 Exhibit B to Ferrari Dec., # 4 Exhibit C to Ferrari Dec., # 5 Exhibit D to Ferrari Dec., # 6 Exhibit E to Ferrari Dec., # 7 Exhibit F to Ferrari Dec., # 8 Exhibit G to Ferrari Dec., # 9 Exhibit H to Ferrari Dec., # 10 Exhibit I to Ferrari Dec., # 11 Exhibit J to Ferrari Dec., # 12 Exhibit K to Ferrari Dec., # 13 Exhibit L to Ferrari Dec., # 14 Exhibit M to Ferrari Dec., # 15 Exhibit N to Ferrari Dec., # 16 Exhibit O to Ferrari Dec., # 17 Exhibit P to Ferrari Dec., # 18 Exhibit Q to Ferrari Dec., # 19 Exhibit R to Ferrari Dec., # 20 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified text on 8/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2014 Filing 627 OBJECTIONS to re 623 Bill of Costs, Emblaze's Objections to Apple's Bill of Costs by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 4, 2014 Remark: Admitted Exhibits Trial Binders retrieved by Apple. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REQUESTING EXHIBITS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE DURING TRIAL BE HELD IN THE CUSTODY OF APPLE INC. by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 625 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 625 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Requesting Exhibits Admitted Into Evidence During Trial be Held in the Custody of Apple Inc. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER GRANTING 622 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 25, 2014 Filing 623 BILL OF COSTS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Declaration Douglas Weider, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 622 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit I to Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit I to Declaration of Douglas Weider)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 621 NOTICE by Emblaze Ltd. Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony Played in Emblaze Ltd.'s Case-In-Chief (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 620 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton, and Exhibits C and N to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 464 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified text on 7/18/2014,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Filing 619 EXHIBITS Exhibit A to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motions in Limine [Dkt. 445] re-filed publicly filed byApple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 618 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-11-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 516 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2014. (Related documents(s) 516 ) (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 617 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-10-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 616 REDACTED Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-9-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 615 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-9-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 614 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-8-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 613 REDACTED Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 612 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 611 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony Played in Apple Inc.'s Case-In-Chief (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 610 JUDGMENT. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 609 JURY VERDICT. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 608 JURY NOTES. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 607 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 7/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER RE: APPLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S PRIOR SEALING ORDER 519 by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 552 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 605 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 8) and begin deliberations held on 7/10/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER RE: TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 603 REVISED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 602 VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 601 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 600 [PROPOSED] FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 9, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 599 [PROPOSED] VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 9, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 598 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 7/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter(s): Lee-Anne Shortridge & Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 597 RESPONSE (re 593 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the Close of Plaintiff's Case ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 596 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. Amended Proposed Verdict Form. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 595 Exhibit List (8th Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 594 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 7/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 593 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the Close of Plaintiff's Case filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2014. Replies due by 7/29/2014. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 592 Proposed Form of Verdict by Emblaze Ltd. Amended Proposed Verdict Form. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 591 Exhibit List (7th Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 590 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 589 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-3-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 588 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-2-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 587 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-1-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 586 ***FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE OF DOC #567***Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-27-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 585 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 7/7/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter(s) Lee-Anne Shortridge & Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 584 Proposed Jury Instructions by Emblaze Ltd. Proposed Joint Final Jury Instructions. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 6, 2014 Filing 583 Brief Emblaze Ltd.'s Bench Brief Concerning Apple Inc.'s Use of Its Own Patents as a Defense to Infringement filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/6/2014)
July 6, 2014 Filing 582 RESPONSE (re 577 MOTION to Amend/Correct Emblaze's Bench Brief For Clarification of This Court's Order Regarding Apple's Motions For Summary Judgment and Emblaze's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions [D.E. 424] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2014)
July 6, 2014 Filing 581 Brief Bench Brief on Relevance of Apple's HLS Patents to Damages, Non-Infringement and Lack of Specific Inudcement filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2014)
July 4, 2014 Filing 580 Exhibit List (Fifth Amended) by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/4/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 579 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 7/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter(s): Lee-Anne Shortridge & Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/3/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 578 Exhibit List (6th Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 577 MOTION For Clarification of This Court's 424 Order Regarding Apple's Motions For Summary Judgment and Emblaze's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions [D.E. 424 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/16/2014. Replies due by 7/23/2014. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/2/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2014 Filing 576 Exhibit List (Fourth Amended) by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 575 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 7/2/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (Court Reporter(s): Lee-Anne Shortridge & Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER GRANTING-AS-MODIFIED STIPULATION REQUESTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-as-modified 573 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 573 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Their Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 572 OBJECTIONS to re 569 Objection Emblaze's Opposition To Apple's Bench Brief Concerning Emblaze's Proposed Revised Claim Constructions by Emblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 571 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 7/1/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporters: Lee-Anne Shortridge & Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 570 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/30/2014, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 569 Objections to Emblaze's Proposed Revised Claim Constructions by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2014 Filing 568 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 6/30/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 567 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-27-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 566 Exhibit List (5th Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 561 Stipulation. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 564 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 6/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 563 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 27, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 562 Exhibit List Apple Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 561 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Their Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 560 Exhibit List (4th Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 559 Witness List by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Second Amended Witness List. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 558 EXHIBITS re 494 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, Exhibits V, W and Z to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W, # 2 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 494 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 557 EXHIBITS re 464 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Exhibits A, B, J, K and L to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 2, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 464 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 556 EXHIBITS re [D.E. 461] Motion in Limine No. 2 and Exhibits A, B and C to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 555 EXHIBITS re [D.E. 459] Motion in Limine No. 5, Exhibit A to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 554 EXHIBITS re [D.E. 456] Motion in Limine No. 4, Exhibit B to Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari (re-filed publicly) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 553 STIPULATION re 552 Administrative Motion to File Under seal portions Stipulation Regarding Defendant Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Filing 552 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 551 EXHIBITS re 488 Opposition/Response to Motion, Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark Fowler [re-filed publicly] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 488 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 550 EXHIBITS re 448 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Exhibits 2, 3 and 4 to Declaration of Roger Pantos [re-filed publicly] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 448 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 549 [PROPOSED] PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 25, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 546 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER RE: JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 25, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 546 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8723766.) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 545 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER RE: APPLE'S MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EMBLAZE'S DAMAGES EXPERTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 428 and 430 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER GRANTING (AS MODIFIED) JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT DURING TRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 534 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 542 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 24, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 540 Exhibit List Third Amended Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 539 TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 23, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 538 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Initial Deposition Designations (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 537 OBJECTIONS to Objections and Counter-Designations to Emblaze's Deposition Counter-Designations by Apple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 536 OBJECTIONS to Objections and Counter-Designations to Emblaze's Deposition Designations by Apple Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 535 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Lodging of Deposition Designations (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 534 Joint MOTION Joint Motion For Order Permitting Use Of Equipment During Trial filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/7/2014. Replies due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 533 EXHIBITS re 491 Reply to Opposition/Response, Exhibit 2 to Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton [re-filed publicly] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 491 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 532 OBJECTIONS to Apple Inc.'s Initial Deposition Designations by Emblaze Ltd.. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 531 OBJECTIONS to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Deposition Counter-Designation by Emblaze Ltd.. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 530 Exhibit List Plaintiff Emblaze Ltd.'s List of Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations by Emblaze Ltd... (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 529 Exhibit List Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibits by Emblaze Ltd... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 528 Exhibit List Objections to Emblaze's Third Supplemental Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 527 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing (telephonic) held on 6/20/2014 before Hon. Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 6/20/2014). (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 522 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 525 Letter from Plaintiff Emblaze Ltd. . (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 524 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 523 ) set for 6/20/2014 at 11:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 523 Letter from Defendant Apple Inc. to Hon. Paul S. Grewal requesting telephone conference. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 522 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Their Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 521 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/17/2014, before Judge Grewal. Court ReporterIrene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporteruntil the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 517 Transcript Order, 515 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2014. (Related documents(s) 517 , 515 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART APPLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF EMBLAZE'S ACCUSED METHOD CLAIMS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 469 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER RE: PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 432 , 443 , 444 , 445 , 447 , 452 , 453 , 455 , 456 , 458 , 459 , 460 , 461 , 463 , 484 , 487 , 490 and 493 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 518 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Emblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 514 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference, Hearing on Daubert Motions, Motions in Limine and Motion for Summary Judgment (In Re: Docket Nos. 428 , 430 , 432 , 443 , 445 , 453 , 456 , 459 , 461 and 469 ) held on 6/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Court to issue written order re: Daubert Motions, Motions in Limine and Motion for Summary Judgment. Court to also issue trial scheduling order. The Court allots 1 hour per side for voir dire. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 513 NOTICE by Emblaze Ltd. Notice of Lodging of Objections to Apple's Discovery Responses Designated for Trial (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Apple's Discovery Responses Designated for Trial, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 512 NOTICE by Emblaze Ltd. Notice of Lodging of Discovery Response Designations (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Response Designations)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 511 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 493 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 510 RESPONSE to Discovery Response Designations by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 509 OBJECTIONS to Objections and Counter-Designations to Emblaze's Discovery Designations by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 508 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Lodging of Objections and Counter-Designations to Emblaze Discovery Designations (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Lodging of Discovery Response Designations (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME CONCERNING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 505 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 505 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER requesting enlargement of time concerning deposition designations filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REQUESTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND EXHIBIT OBJECTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 502 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 501 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 502 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER requesting enlargement of time for parties to file joint proposed jury instructions and exhibit objections filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 501 MOTION Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Use of Audio Visual Equipment in Courtroom at the Pretrial Conference filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/26/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 500 RESPONSE (re 469 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment Motion of Non-Infringement of Emblaze's Induced Infringement Claims ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to Dec. of L. Ferrari, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 499 Exhibit List Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REQUESTING FOUR-HOUR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR EMBLAZE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 497 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 497 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Four Hour Enlargement of Time For Emblaze to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 496 Exhibit List Amended Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 476 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 494 REPLY (re 432 MOTION to Strike Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Emblaze's Memorandum in Reply to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Exclude Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial, # 4 Unredacted Version of Emblaze's Memorandum in Reply to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Exclude Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit S, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit U, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit V, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit W, # 23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit X, # 24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Z, # 25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AA, # 26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit BB, # 27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit CC, # 28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit DD)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 492 RESPONSE (re 445 MOTION in Limine Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motions in Limine ) Emblaze's Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant Apple's Motions In Limine filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to Ferrari Dec., # 3 Exhibit B to Ferrari Dec., # 4 Exhibit C to Ferrari Dec., # 5 Proposed Order)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 491 REPLY (re 430 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Redacted Version of Reply Brief, # 5 Unredacted Version of Reply Brief, # 6 Exhibit 2 (slip-sheet), # 7 Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exh.t 3, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exh. 3, # 10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exh. 6, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 6, # 12 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 489 Objections to Apple's Proposed Voir Dire and Verdict Form. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified text on 6/12/2014, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 488 RESPONSE (re 459 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Testimony Beyond the Scope of Mr. Malackowski's Expert Report and Expertise ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Fowler, # 2 Exhibit A to Fowler Declaration (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit A to Fowler Declaration (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit B to Fowler Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Fowler Declaration)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Opposition to Emblaze's MIL No. 5 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 486 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 485 Opposition/Response to Motion Certificate of Service in connection with Apple's Opposition to Emblaze's MIL No. 4 (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 485 RESPONSE (re 456 MOTION in Limine No. 4 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Fowler, # 2 Exhibit A Redacted, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed under Seal))(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 484 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 483 RESPONSE (re 461 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude All Testimony That Does Not Comply With the Court's October 22, 2013 Order ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 482 REPLY (re 428 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of David Teece ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 481 RESPONSE (re 453 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony Concerning Vocaltec Communications ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Fowler, # 2 Exhibit A to Fowler Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Fowler Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Fowler Declaration)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 480 RESPONSE (re 443 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Alon Cohen From Testifying At Trial ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A to Gibson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Gibson Declaration)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 479 Witness List by Apple Inc. Objections to Emblaze's Witness List. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 478 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc. Objections to Emblaze's Proposed Voir Dire. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 477 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. Objections to Emblaze's Proposed Verdict Form. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 476 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Requesting Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Their Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 475 Exhibit List (3rd Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 474 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 463 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 473 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 458 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 458 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 472 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 455 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 455 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 471 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 452 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 470 Exhibit List (2nd Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 469 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment Motion of Non-Infringement of Emblaze's Induced Infringement Claims filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/12/2014. Replies due by 6/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A to Gibson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Gibson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Gibson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Gibson Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING APPLE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SHORTENED TIME ON PLAINTIFF EMBLAZE'S INDUCED INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 465 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 467 Witness List by Apple Inc. Amended Witness List. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 466 Exhibit List (Supplemental) by Emblaze Ltd... (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 465 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Summary on Shortened Time on Emblaze's Induced Infringement Claims filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A to Gibson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Gibson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Gibson Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified text on 6/5/2014(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 443 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Alon Cohen From Testifying At Trial. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 464 RESPONSE (re 430 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Emblaze's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton, # 4 Unredacted Version of Emblaze's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A part 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A part 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 462 Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 461 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude All Testimony That Does Not Comply With the Court's October 22, 2013 Order filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 2, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 2, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 459 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Testimony Beyond the Scope of Mr. Malackowski's Expert Report and Expertise filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 458 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 5, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 5, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 457 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine (memorandum filed as Docket No. 445) filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2014 Filing 456 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 455 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 4, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 4, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 454 Pretrial Conference Statement by Emblaze Ltd. . (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 453 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony Concerning Vocaltec Communications filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 3, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion In Limine No. 3, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 451 Exhibit List by Emblaze Ltd... (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 450 Witness List by Emblaze Ltd. . (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 449 Proposed Form of Verdict by Emblaze Ltd. . (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 448 RESPONSE (re 432 MOTION to Strike Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial ) Opposition to Emblaze's Motion to Exclude Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D (under seal), # 6 Exhibit E (redacted), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L (under seal), # 14 Declaration Roger Pantos, # 15 Exhibit 1 (under seal), # 16 Exhibit 2 (under seal), # 17 Exhibit 3 (under seal), # 18 Exhibit 4 (under seal), # 19 Exhibit 5 (under seal), # 20 Exhibit 6 (under seal), # 21 Exhibit 7 (under seal), # 22 Exhibit 8 (under seal))(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 5 Exhibit D under seal, # 6 Exhibit D slipsheet, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exh. E, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exh. E, # 9 Exhibit L under seal, # 10 Exhibit L slipsheet, # 11 Exhibit 1 under seal, # 12 Exhibit 1 slipsheet, # 13 Exhibit 2 under seal, # 14 Exhibit 2 slipsheet, # 15 Exhibit 3 under seal, # 16 Exhibit 3 slipsheet, # 17 Exhibit 4 under seal, # 18 Exhibit 4 slipsheet, # 19 Exhibit 5 under seal, # 20 Exhibit 5 slipsheet, # 21 Exhibit 6 under seal, # 22 Exhibit 6 slipsheet, # 23 Exhibit 7 under seal, # 24 Exhibit 7 slipsheet, # 25 Exhibit 8 under seal, # 26 Exhibit 8 slipsheet, # 27 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 446 Proposed Voir Dire by Emblaze Ltd. . (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 445 MOTION in Limine Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 444 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exh. A, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exh. A, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exh. B, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exh. B, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 443 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Alon Cohen From Testifying At Trial filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Responses due by 6/17/2014. Replies due by 6/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to L. Ferrari, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 442 RESPONSE (re 428 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of David Teece ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration L. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A to L. Ferrari, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 441 Witness List by Apple Inc. . (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 440 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc. . (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 439 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc. . (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO LODGE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 437 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 437 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Enlargement of Time to Lodge Deposition Designations and Discovery Responses filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lisa Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 436 SEALING ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER GRANTING 429 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 434 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 431 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V. Isola (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 432 MOTION to Strike Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/3/2014. Replies due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion to Exclude Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion to Exclude Apple's Damages Expert From Testifying at Trial, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 430 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Catharine Lawton filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/3/2014. Replies due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Brief, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 4 under seal, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 5 under seal, # 15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 428 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of David Teece filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/3/2014. Replies due by 6/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 427 Letter from Martin B. Pavane . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 425 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 425 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Enlargement of Time for Daubert Motions filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER RE: APPLE'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND EMBLAZE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 343 , 346 , 348 , 350 and 401 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 423 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Microsoft Corporation for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 422 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Moore Dooley (Dooley, Nathan) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 421 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/08/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2014. (Related documents(s) 418 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 420 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lisa A. Ferrari (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Buergi, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 418 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 417 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473, 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams, 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers, 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, and 401 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Court to issue written order after hearing. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 416 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 409 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Notice of Withdrawal of Exhibits 11-14 to the Declaration of Robert C. Williams in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity) (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 415 OBJECTIONS to re 409 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Emblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 414 REPLY (re 401 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AT HEARING ON APPLE INC.'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 412 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 412 MOTION Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Use of Audio Visual Equipment in Courtroom at Hearing on Apple Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/17/2014. Replies due by 4/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 411 RESPONSE (re 401 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) Opposition to Plaintiff Emblaze Ltd.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 410 REPLY (re 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 409 REPLY (re 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Michael Orchard, # 2 Declaration of Robert Williams, # 3 Exhibit 10 to Williams Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 11 to Williams Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 12 to Williams Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 13 to Williams Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 14 to Williams Declaration)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 408 REPLY (re 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers ) filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 407 REPLY (re 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams ) filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER GRANTING 400 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 26, 2014 Filing 405 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 400 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 404 RESPONSE (re 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REQUESTING SHORTENING OF TIME ON EMBLAZE'S MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 402 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 402 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 401 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions (Shortening Time) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 401 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/7/2014. Replies due by 4/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Exhibit F, # 4 Unredacted version of Exhibit F)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 386 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER DENYING 389 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Because the designating party (Akamai) has not filed any timely declaration supporting the requested sealing, the motion is denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 18, 2014 Filing 397 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT APRIL 8, 2014 HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473, 383 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams, 384 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers, 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. 4/8/2014 10:00 AM Motions reset to 1:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 396 Declaration of Ryan Moran in Support of 386 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 386 ) (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 378 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART APPLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE INFRINGEMENT THEORIES FROM DR. MADISETTI'S by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 304 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emblaze Ltd. to Nielsen Co. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emblaze Ltd. to Major League Baseball (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emblaze Ltd. to Akamai Technologies, Inc. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 390 RESPONSE (re 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Nemiroff, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D part 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit D part 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Nemiroff, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Emblaze's Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 as to Specific Accused Content Providers, # 4 Unredacted version of Emblaze's Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 as to Specific Accused Content Providers, # 5 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 388 RESPONSE (re 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Nemiroff, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 part 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 3 part 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti, # 13 Exhibit 1 to Madisetti Declaration)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 387 RESPONSE (re 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 386 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Emblaze's Opposition to Defendant Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement, # 4 Unredacted version of Emblaze's Opposition to Defendant Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit N, # 9 Exhibit T, # 10 Exhibit T, # 11 Exhibit U, # 12 Exhibit U)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 385 RESPONSE (re 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martin B. Pavane, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Declaration of Dr. Vijay Madisetti, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Madisetti Declaration)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit A to the Orchard Declaration)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 383 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 10)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2014 Filing 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 381 EXHIBITS re 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Sarah Barrows filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 343 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 380 RESPONSE (re 378 MOTION to Continue Motion for an Order Continuing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 379 DECLARATION of MARTIN PAVANE in Opposition to 378 MOTION to Continue Motion for an Order Continuing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 378 ) (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 378 MOTION to Continue Motion for an Order Continuing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Erin Gibson, # 2 Declaration Ryan Moran, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER GRANTING SEALING OF AKAMAI'S EXHIBIT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 7, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 342 , 344 , 347 and 349 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Daniel Anderson (Anderson, Jacob) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chen Williams (Williams, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by John Allcock (Allcock, John) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J Blanco (Blanco, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Paige Gibson Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Fowler (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Anne Celentano (Celentano, Krista) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Buergi (Buergi, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 367 Declaration of Christopher R. Knox in Support of 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAkamai Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 347 ) (Judson, David) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 318 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW P. NEMIROFF PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 360 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 363 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 363 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed by Emblaze Ltd. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 362 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 349 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 344 , 347 , 342 , 349 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER DENYING APPLE'S MOTION FOR STAY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 317 Motion to Stay. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 360 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR ANDREW P. NEMIROFF Filing fee previously paid on 2/24/2014 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 Filing 359 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 360 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew P. Nemiroff ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8400113.) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified on 2/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 358 AMENDED ORDER re: 357 GRANTING-IN-PART EMBLAZE'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-3. re: 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473, 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams, 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers, and 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Responses due by 3/13/2014. Replies due by 3/27/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 24, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 355 re: 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473, 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams, 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers, and 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 23, 2014 Filing 356 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-2-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (Related documents(s) 321 ) (las, ) (Filed on 2/23/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 355 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff Emblaze's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Apple's Four Motions for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 353 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 353 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 349 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Requesting Extension of Deadline to File Declarations in Support of Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. to NFL (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 351 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. to Akamai Technologies (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 350 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Declaration of Dr. Michael Orchard, # 13 Exhibit A to Orchard Declaration, # 14 Exhibit B to Orchard Declaration, # 15 Exhibit C to Orchard Declaration)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 349 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit A to Orchard Declaration, # 14 Exhibit A to Orchard Declaration)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Specific Content Providers filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Specific Content Providers, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to Specific Content Providers, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 10)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to All Accused Streams filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Declaration of Dr. Nathaniel Polish)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 345 EXHIBITS re 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Related document(s) 344 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,473 filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah Barrows, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 6A, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14 (Part 1 of 2), # 18 Exhibit 14 (Part 2 of 2), # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18 (Part 1 of 3), # 23 Exhibit 18 (Part 2 of 3), # 24 Exhibit 18 (Part 3 of 3))(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Ullmer, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 16, # 4 Exhibit 16)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 341 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Microsoft Corporation for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 340 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 339 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/11/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2014. (Related documents(s) 337 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 338 Request for Judicial Notice of the Supreme Court of the United States' April 2014 Argument Schedule filed byApple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 336 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. The court will permit Apple to submit multiple summary judgment briefs. Deadline to file motion for summary judgment briefs and oppositions are extended by 1 day. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER DENYING 332 MOTION TO CONTINUE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 10, 2014 Filing 334 RESPONSE (re 332 MOTION to Continue ) filed byApple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 333 REPLY (re 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 332 MOTION to Continue re 328 Clerks Notice Continuing 317 Motion Hearing, (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/10/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 331 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** MOTION to Appear by Telephone re: motion for protective order (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 330 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the hearing re: motion for protective order (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/10/2014,(incorrect event selected,) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 329 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT FEBRUARY 11, 2014 MOTION TO STAY: Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 328 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MARCH 4, 2014 MOTION TO STAY, advancing 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case : 3/4/2014 Motion Hearing is advanced to 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 327 Declaration of MARTIN B. PAVANE in Support of 325 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 325 ) (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 326 Proposed Order re 317 Motion by Emblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 325 OPPOSITION (re 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 324 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 327 Declaration of Martin B. Pavane in support of opposition 325 (re 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case ) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified text on 2/7/2014,(to confirm with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/7/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Microsoft Corporation for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 322 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/21/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2014. (Related documents(s) 320 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 318 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendant Apple Inc.'s 317 Motion to Stay Pending a Decision from the United States Supreme Court in the Akamai Case and that Hearing Occur Telephonically filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 1/23/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 317 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision from the Supreme Court in the Akamai Case filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/6/2014. Replies due by 2/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Proposed Order)(Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 316 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 314 Stipulation.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 314 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Permission to Take Two Expert Depositions Outside Expert Discovery Period filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 313 REPLY (re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Exhibit 8)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 312 Declaration (re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report ) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified text on 12/11/2013,(incorrect event posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Filing 311 Proposed Order filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified text on 12/11/2013,(incorrect event selected by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Filing 310 RESPONSE (re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 309 EXHIBITS re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report Exhibit 1-B to the Declaration of Douglas Weider In Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Theories From Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Exhibit 1-B to the Declaration of Douglas Weider In Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Theories From Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report)(Related document(s) 304 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 308 EXHIBITS re 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report Exhibit 1-A to the Declaration of Douglas Weider In Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Theories From Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Exhibit 1-A to the Declaration of Douglas Weider In Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Theories From Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report)(Related document(s) 304 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF BRIEFING DEADLINES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 306 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 306 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines on Apple's Motion To Strike filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER DENYING 303 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Because the designating party did not file any timely responsive declaration, see Civ. L. R. 79-5(e)(1), the document will be made part of the public record and the submitting party shall proceed consist with Civ. L. R. 79-5(e)(2). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 25, 2013 Filing 304 MOTION to Strike Infringement Theories from Emblaze's Infringement Expert Report filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Replies due by 12/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Weider, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1-A, # 4 Exhibit 1-B, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service to MLB Advanced Media, L.P.)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1-A, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1-A - Part 1, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1-A - Part 2, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1-B, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1-B - Part 1, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1-B - Part 2)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE UNTIL NOVEMBER 9, 2013 AT 9:00 A.M. (PST) TO SERVE EXPERT REPORTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 301 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 301 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER granting extension of deadline until November 9, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. (PST) to serve expert reports filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 3-6 by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 299 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 299 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-6 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER CORRECTING DATE FOR DESIGNATION OF REBUTTAL EXPERTS WITH REPORTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 297 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 297 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 294 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order (JOINT) STIPULATION RE DEADLINE FOR DESIGNATION OF REBUTTAL OF EXPERTS filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 296 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/22/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (Related documents(s) 295 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 295 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART EMBLAZE'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING APPLE'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 246 and denying 280 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 291 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 246 MOTION to Compel and 280 MOTION for Protective Order: The court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 290 RESPONSE (re 280 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Nemiroff, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EMBLAZE'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT OCTOBER 22, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 287 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 288 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 279 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, 285 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Emblaze's Motion to Compel D.E. 257 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-1, # 2 Exhibit 3 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-3, # 3 Exhibit 5 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-5, # 4 Exhibit 9 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-9, # 5 Exhibit 13 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-13, # 6 Exhibit 14 to Barrows Decl. D.E. 258-14, # 7 Declaration of M. Buckley D.E. 259)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 287 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 286 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING, Advancing 280 MOTION for Protective Order: 11/26/2013 Motion Hearing is advanced to 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 283 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 20, 2013 Filing 284 STIPULATION re 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/20/2013)
October 20, 2013 Filing 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Moran Declaration in Support of Apple's Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order RE Apple's Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Moran Declaration in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Moran Declaration in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of D.E. 258-5 - Exhibit 5 to the Barrows Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition to Emblaze's Motion to Compel, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of D.E. 259 - Declaration of Mark Buckley in support of Apple's Opposition to Emblaze's Motion to Compel)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/20/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 282 STIPULATION re 280 MOTION for Protective Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 281 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF DOUGLAS WEIDER)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 281 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 282 STIPULATION re 211 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF DOUGLAS WEIDER)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/28/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 280 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/1/2013. Replies due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration OF DOUGLAS WEIDER, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 245 , 256 , and 264 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 278 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/11/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (Related documents(s) 277 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 277 *****DUPLICATE OF DOCKET 276*****TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/15/2013) Modified on 10/17/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2013 Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 275 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 252 MOTION for Protective Order: The court grants defendant's motion for protective order without prejudice to any issues raised in pending motion to compel from Emblaze. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 274 REPLY (re 252 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF S. BARROWS, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 273 Declaration of RYAN MORAN in Support of 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 264 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO TAKE RE-OPENED DEPOSITION OF SHARON CARMEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 271 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Take Re-Opened Deposition of Sharon Carmel filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EMBLAZE'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT OCTOBER 11, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANT APPLE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 268 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 269 Proposed Order re 268 Notice (Other) GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Emblaze Ltd.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 268 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Emblaze Ltd. re 252 MOTION for Protective Order (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 10/4/2013) Modified on 10/4/2013,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2013 Filing 267 RESPONSE (re 252 MOTION for Protective Order ) Emblaze's Opposition to Motion For Protective Order filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 266 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 265 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 265 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 265 REPLY (re 246 MOTION to Compel ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Reply Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Reply Brief, # 5 Ex. C to Reply Declaration - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MODIFIED ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 260 Motion to Shorten Time. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME ON THE COURT'S SCHEDULE OF DATES AND DEADLINES by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 254 . 3/11/2014 Pretrial Conference is continued to 6/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. 3/24/2014 Jury Trial is continued to 6/30/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 262 Order on Stipulation: Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 6/30/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 261 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/26/2013: The court proposes available dates for continuance of trial. 6/30/13 and 7/7/13 at 9:30 AM presently available. The court's preference is to proceed with 6/30/13 trial. Parties to email Courtroom Deputy Oscar Rivera no later than 9/30/13 to confirm availability. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:48 to 4:58.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION to Shorten Time On Apple's Motion for a Protective Order D.E. 252 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 259 Declaration of MARK BUCKLEY in Support of 257 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 257 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 258 Declaration of SARAH BARROWS in Support of 257 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 257 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 257 RESPONSE (re 246 MOTION to Compel ) filed byApple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF R. MORAN, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 255 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: 254 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME ON COURT'S SCHEDULE OF DATES AND DEADLINES: Hearing set for 9/26/2013 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 254 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 248 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 253 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing 252 MOTION for Protective Order: Due to the court's unavailability, the 10/29/2013 Motion Hearing is continued to 11/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 252 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/7/2013. Replies due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 251 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/20/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2013. (Related documents(s) 249 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 250 RESPONSE (re 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Ryan Moran Declaration In Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal GRANTING-IN-PART 216 and 231 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 247 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 246 MOTION to Compel filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 246 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 246 MOTION to Compel filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/25/2013. Replies due by 10/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR FILING DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 243 Stipulation (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Filing Discovery Motions filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING 230 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 20, 2013 Filing 239 Letter from Martin B. Pavane re August 20, 2013 hearing. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 238 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 216 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions and 231 MOTION for Relief: The court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 237 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 235 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 235 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 236 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 235 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Related document(s) 235 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 235 RESPONSE (re 231 MOTION for Relief ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 234 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Naftali Shani Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(d) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER SHORTENING TIME AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 232 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 232 MOTION to Shorten Time APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON 231 MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas R. Weider, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37 filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/19/2013. Replies due by 8/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas R. Weider, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified text on 8/6/2013, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2013 Filing 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 229 REPLY (re 216 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah E. Barrrows, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Douglas R. Weider, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING 227 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 2, 2013 Filing 227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 224 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by William Sloan Coats, III (Coats, William) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 225 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 224 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 224 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 224 RESPONSE (re 216 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER RE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal re 217 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 222 Appendix re 220 Appendix, Douglas Weider Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 220 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING 215 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 16, 2013 Filing 220 Appendix re 215 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7833033.) Doug Weider Certificate of Good Standing filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 215 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 219 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 218 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 218 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 218 RESPONSE (re 217 MOTION to Shorten Time ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 217 MOTION to Shorten Time re: 216 MOTION for leave to amend filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2013 Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/26/2013. Replies due by 8/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 215 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7833033.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 214 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 207 MOTION for Reconsideration re 169 Order: The court amends earlier construction of the term "each slice having a predetermined data size associated therewith" to "each slice having a data size, which may be established by setting a time duration of the slice, assigned in advance of the stream being divided" (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 213 RESPONSE (re 207 MOTION for Reconsideration re 169 Order OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 212 Letter Brief re 198 Order on Motion to Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 198 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 210 Letter Brief re 198 Order on Motion to Compel filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Related document(s) 198 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 209 Letter Brief re 198 Order on Motion to Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 198 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 208 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 202 Affidavit filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 207 MOTION for Reconsideration re 169 Order OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 205 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 202 Affidavit, 198 Order on Motion to Compel filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 202 , 198 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (Correcting Last Day for Dispositive Motion Hearing Date): Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/6/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 207 MOTION for Reconsideration re 169 Order OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER: Emblaze may file an opposition no later than 6/14/2013. Apple shall not file a reply. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 201 Motion for Leave to File (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 204 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/28/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2013. (Related documents(s) 200 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 211 ***CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/6/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/12/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Filing 202 AFFIDAVIT re 198 Order on Motion to Compel by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 201 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed motion for reconsideration of claim construction order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal re 156 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 197 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 156 MOTION to Compel: The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. The court grants Apple's request to withdraw its Motion to Compel Non-Party Ladas & Parry, LLP to Produce Documents and Prepare a 30(B)(6) Witness (Doc. 192 ). (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 196 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 195 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING 191 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 21, 2013 Filing 194 Declaration of Non-Party Ladas & Parry CORRECTED in Support of 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 191 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Non-Party Ladas & Parry Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(d) in Opposition to 192 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Ladas & Parry, LLP to Produce Documents and Prepare a 30(b)(6) Witness filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 192 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 192 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Ladas & Parry, LLP to Produce Documents and Prepare a 30(b)(6) Witness filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/28/2013. Replies due by 6/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sarah Barrows, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING 180 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING 158 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE, re 183 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 Resetting 156 MOTION to Compel EMBLAZE TO SEARCH ITS ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION WITH APPLE'S PROPOSED KEYWORD SEARCHES AND IDENTIFY AVAILABLE ELECTRONIC DATA FOR RELEVANT CUSTODIANS: 5/14/2013 Motion Hearing reset to 5/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 187 Declaration of SARAH E. BARROWS in Support of 186 Opposition/Response to Motion TO CHANGE MAY 14, 2013 HEARING DATE filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 186 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 186 RESPONSE (re 183 MOTION to Continue ) APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO EMBLAZE MOTION TO CHANGE MAY 14, 2013 HEARING DATE filed byApple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Microsoft Corporation for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 184 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 183 MOTION Pursuant to L.R. 6-3 to Change May 14, 2013 Hearing Date filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 183 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 183 MOTION to Continue May 14, 2013 Hearing Date 156 MOTION to compel filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Responses due by 5/17/2013. Replies due by 5/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/3/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 182 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 180 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 181 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-17-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2013. (Related documents(s) 177 ) (las, ) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 179 REPLY (re 156 MOTION to Compel EMBLAZE TO SEARCH ITS ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION WITH APPLE'S PROPOSED KEYWORD SEARCHES AND IDENTIFY AVAILABLE ELECTRONIC DATA FOR RELEVANT CUSTODIANS ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Steven Ullmer, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Emblaze Ltd. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Neiman, Marilyn) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 23, 2013 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. 168 minutes - for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/23/2013) Modified on 4/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - JULIE P. BOOKBINDER (Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/22/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - SCOTT J. BORNSTEIN (Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/22/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - KENNETH STEINTHAL (Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/22/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Ullmer (Ullmer, Stephen) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 172 Declaration of Hagit Gal in Support of 170 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Related document(s) 170 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 171 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 170 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 170 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 170 RESPONSE (re 156 MOTION to Compel EMBLAZE TO SEARCH ITS ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION WITH APPLE'S PROPOSED KEYWORD SEARCHES AND IDENTIFY AVAILABLE ELECTRONIC DATA FOR RELEVANT CUSTODIANS ) filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER re 111 Brief filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 19, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 168 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference, Tutorial and Claims Construction held on 4/17/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Case management scheduling order to be issued. Court to issue constructions. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER ALLOWING EMBLAZE LTD. TO BRING MULTIMEDIA EQUIPMENT TO COURT by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 165 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 166 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 4/17/2013 CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 4/17/2013 10:00 AM Claims Construction and Case Management Conference reset to 1:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 165 MOTION to Allow Emblaze Ltd. to Bring Multimedia Equipment to Court filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Responses due by 4/30/2013. Replies due by 5/7/2013. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 164 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY of 162 Proposed Order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 163 Declaration of Naftali Shani in Support of 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS filed byEmblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 162 *** CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY *** Proposed Order Allowing Emblaze Ltd. to Bring Multimedia Equipment to Court by Emblaze Ltd.. (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/10/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ALLOWING PERMISSION TO BRING TO COURT CERTAIN MULTIMEDIA EQUIPMENT, granting 159 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/10/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 160 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (THIRD) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 9, 2013 Filing 159 Proposed Order Allowing Permission to Bring to Court Certain Multimedia Equipment by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 157 Declaration of SARAH BARROWS in Support of 156 MOTION to Compel EMBLAZE TO SEARCH ITS ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION WITH APPLE'S PROPOSED KEYWORD SEARCHES AND IDENTIFY AVAILABLE ELECTRONIC DATA FOR RELEVANT CUSTODIANS filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 17 Exhibit 17 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 20 Exhibit 20 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 21 Exhibit 21 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 156 MOTION to Compel EMBLAZE TO SEARCH ITS ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION WITH APPLE'S PROPOSED KEYWORD SEARCHES AND IDENTIFY AVAILABLE ELECTRONIC DATA FOR RELEVANT CUSTODIANS filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/19/2013. Replies due by 4/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 155 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2013 before Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 3/12/2013). (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2013)
March 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 154 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 153 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 6, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge GREWAL, Motions terminated: 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Re-Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc... Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/5/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Re-Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaz Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/22/2013) Modified on 2/25/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 149 Order Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2013 Filing 148 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand re 146 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 2/1/2013) Modified on 2/4/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Markman Hearing To April 18, 2013, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 146 Answer with Jury Demand to Second Amended Complaint; COUNTERCLAIM against Emblaze Ltd., filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re 145 Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2013. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 145 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/2/2013 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 1/2/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2013 10:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/27/2013 10:00 AM. 4.0 HOURS () (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/2/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re 142 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND EMBLAZES DEADLINE TO ANSWER AND/OR OPPOSE APPLES MOTION TO DISMISS EMBLAZES SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL FEBRUARY 1, 2013 filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 143 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. Filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 12/18/2012) Modified on 12/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2012 Filing 142 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND EMBLAZES DEADLINE TO ANSWER AND/OR OPPOSE APPLES MOTION TO DISMISS EMBLAZES SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL FEBRUARY 1, 2013 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 12/14/2012) Modified on 12/17/2012 (kcS, ).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 140 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 12/7/2012) Modified on 12/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Markman Hearing for 1/30/13, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2013 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/29/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 27, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re 137 Order. Second Amended Complaint due by 12/18/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Dismiss; denying 124 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 136 SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 11/21/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 11/29/2012 02:45 PM. via telephone. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 8, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re 135 Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2012 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/8/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 31, 2012 Filing 134 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL 11/28/12 filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified on 11/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Cancelling Deadline Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/23/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE SUBSEQUENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON OCTOBER 24, 2012, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified on 10/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 Filing 131 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE 130 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 130 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE ON OCTOBER 24, 2012 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 128 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Marilyn Neiman (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 128 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Marilyn Neiman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009373.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/07/12 filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 127 Brief re 111 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Emblaze Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2012 Filing 126 Memorandum in Opposition re 124 Motion to Strike, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/20/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Filing 125 Proposed Order re 124 Motion to Strike by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION to Strike Objection to Reply Evidence, filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/7/2012. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 Filing 122 OBJECTIONS to Reply Evidence Submitted By Apple In Connection With Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 7/13/2012) Modified on 7/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Filing 120 Declaration of Dennis Meraz in Support of 118 Response, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 118 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Filing 119 Declaration of John Handy in Support of 118 Response, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 118 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Filing 118 Response and Evidence re 111 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2012 Filing 117 Declaration of JAMES DECARLO in Support of 116 Opposition/Response to Motion, APPLE'S MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) TO DISMISS EMBLAZE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 116 ) (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 Filing 116 RESPONSE (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLE'S MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) TO DISMISS EMBLAZE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED filed byApple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 5, 2012 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Lisa A. Ferrari in Opposition to 105 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition re 105 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2012 Filing 113 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Jury Demand, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 6/4/2012) Modified on 6/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 Filing 112 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 111 Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 Filing 111 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 108 Stipulation. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss shall be due 06/05/12 and the Reply to Opposition shall be due 06/14/12. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/24/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the deadline to file Answer/Response to Amended Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 05/21/12. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Responses due by 6/5/2012. Replies due by 6/14/2012. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines on Apple's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 104 Stipulation. Markman and Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 10/31/12 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/17/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2012 Filing 106 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand; COUNTERCLAIM against Emblaze Ltd. by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2012 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Markman Hearing and Case Management Conference, filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Terms for Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 102 Proposed Order re 101 Stipulation, by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 101 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Amended Complaint re 100 Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc.. Filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/27/2012) Modified on 4/30/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 75 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the Amended Complaint within (5) five-days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 04/23/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 4/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART APPLE'S REQUEST FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSES 93 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 97 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT, filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Pavane, Martin) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Filing 96 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Telephonic Discovery Hearing to 4/16/2012 02:30 PM with Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties shall contact Lili Harrell at 415.522.2039 to confirm their participation in the conference call. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 93 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/23/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstong granting 91 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael A. Nicodema. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 93 Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Magistrate Judge Nathanel Cousins re Request for Order to Compel, from James J. DeCarlo, Lisa A. Ferrari, Kenneth L. Steinthal, dated 03/21/12 (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Terms, filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 4/2/2012. Replies due by 4/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/19/2012) Modified on 3/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Nicodema ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611008533.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/19/12 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 90 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 2/28/12 before Judge Spero. Case did not settle. Parties to contact Judge Spero's chambers after Claim Construction to set a further settlement conference date. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/29/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 89 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Exchange Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence, filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/24/2012) Modified on 2/27/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Apple Inc. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/16/2012) Modified on 2/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Apple Inc. (Barrows, Sarah) (Filed on 2/16/2012) Modified on 2/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING re 85 Stipulation To Reschedule Settlement Conference to Feb. 28, 2012 filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc. Settlement Conference re-set for 2/28/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/17/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 85 STIPULATION to Reschedule Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re 78 Order, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/13/2012) Modified on 1/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: That the Mandatory Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero has been EXTENDED to 02/29/12, re 83 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION to Request Order Changing Time to Complete Mandatory Settlement Conference re 73 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/9/2012) Modified on 1/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 82 CLERKS NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct Emblaze Ltd.'s Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 81 Statement or Nonopposition re 75 MOTION to Amend the Pleadings by Apple Inc. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY MATERIALS, re 79 Proposed Order, filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/22/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 79 Proposed Order re Motion for Entry of Protective Order, by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/22/2011) Modified on 12/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING re 77 Stipulation To Reschedule Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero to Feb. 8, 2012 filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc. Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Reschedule Settlement Conference to 02/08/12 by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 76 Declaration of Lisa A. Ferrari in Support of 75 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 12/29/2011. Replies due by 1/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2011 Filing 74 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 11/15/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for MADATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to take place within (90) ninety-days of this Order. Case REMOVED from ENE Program. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/9/2011 by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 1, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/1/2011 by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/9/2011 at 10:00 AM.(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 25, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 10/25/2011 by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 19, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 10/25/2011 at 8:30 a.m. Pacific. Please refer to previous notice for call-in information. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 72 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Evaluator Yarolsoav Sochynsky and Scheduling ADR Phone Conference for 10/19/2011 at 8:30 a.m. Pacific Time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 17, 2011 ADR Unit RECEIVED OBJECTIONS by Apple, Inc. to 71 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing ENE Evaluator Yaroslav Sochynsky. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 71 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Yaroslav Sochynsky as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 3, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 10/3/2011 with Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 70 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/26/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Please call 661-673-8600 and use access code 956682 to connect to the call. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 9/26/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time is off calendar and will be rescheduled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/26/2011 at 9:00 a.m. has been rescheduled to 10/3/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Call-in information remains the same. Please call 661-673-8600 and use access code 956682. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/20/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/21/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 66 Proposed Order Concerning September 15, 2011 Case Management Conference by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order)(Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 9/15/2011). Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2012 09:00 AM. Markman hearing set for 9/26/2012 09:00 AM. FOR 4.0 HOURS.(Court Reporter: Not Reported) Case referred to Magistrate Judge for all discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for ALL Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 8, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 9/8/2011 with Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 03:30 PM. via telephone. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 64 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/8/2011 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific Time. Please call 213-289-5065 and use access code 5417610 to connect to the call at the scheduled time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 63 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Evaluator Daralyn Durie 61 . The ADR Unit will appoint another Evaluator to this matter as soon as possible. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 ADR Unit RECEIVED OBJECTIONS by Emblaze Ltd. to 61 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing ENE Evaluator Daralyn Durie. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 5, 2011 Filing 62 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Emblaze Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Ferrari, Lisa) (Filed on 9/5/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2011 Filing 61 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Daralyn Durie as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Roger S. Thompson terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/11/11. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 10, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/12/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time is off calendar. Per Docket No. 58 Parties are referred to ENE. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Martin L. Fineman and [PROPOSED] ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) signature pages)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge ARMSRONG on 8/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/2/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Roger S. Thompson (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Martin B. Pavane (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Lisa A. Ferrari (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Roger S. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007060.) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lisa A. Ferrari ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007059.) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Martin B. Pavane ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007058.) filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James J. Decarlo (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Julie P. Bookbinder (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 50 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James J. Decarlo (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/31/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/31/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott J. Bornstein (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 49 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Julie P. Bookbinder (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 5/31/11 has been rescheduled to 9/12/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 39 Motion to Vacate (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 43 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 41 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 42 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Julie P. Bookbinder ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006978.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott J. Bornstein ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006976.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James J. Decarlo ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006977.), filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 40 Declaration of Kenneth L. Steinthal in Support of 39 Joint Motion to Vacate The Initial Case Management Conference and Hold May 24, 2011 Deadlines in Abeyance for 90 Days, or until Fourteen Days after Resolution of the Motion for Reconsideration, Whichever Is Sooner filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1, # 2 Exhibit #2, # 3 Exhibit #3, # 4 Exhibit #4, # 5 Exhibit #5, # 6 Exhibit #6, # 7 Exhibit #7, # 8 Exhibit #8)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified on 5/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2011 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Vacate The Initial Case Management Conference and Hold 05/24/11 Deadlines in Abeyance for 90-days, or until 14-days after Resolution of the Motion for Reconsideration, Whichever Is Sooner, filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd.. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified on 5/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2011 Filing 38 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 5/31/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Emblaze Ltd. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Emblaze Ltd. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 5/10/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by Apple Inc., Emblaze Ltd. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/10/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2011 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Apple Inc. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/10/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:45 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011) Modified on 5/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/26/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 29 Proof of Service re 28 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE by Apple Inc (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2011 Filing 28 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignmen to a United States District Judge by Apple Inc. (Steinthal, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 30 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:10-cv-05713. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2011 Filing 27 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, # 3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Transfer (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 25, 2011 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Northern District of California (pl)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 13 Motion to Transfer Case. Defendant's motion to transfer venue to United States District Court for the Northern District of California is GRANTED. The Clerk shall transfer the action and close the file in this District. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/24/11) (pl)
December 17, 2010 Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference re-set for 10/14/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (lnl)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Roger S. Thompson, Esq., dated 12/10/2010, re: Counsel for plaintiff, Emblaze Ltd., writes to request clarification of certain portions of the Case Management Plan [D.E. No. 22] ("the CMP") as set forth. ENDORSEMENT: Paragraph 4 of Order of December 14, 2011, strick "by the later of." Paragraph 5a, Deposition to be completed by the close of fact discovery. Claim hearing adjourned from September 7 to Oct. 14, 2011 at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/17/2010) (lnl)
December 14, 2010 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING:The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge. Jury trial. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days. All fact discovery shall be completed by the later of 3 months after the Court's claim construction ruling or 2/15/12, whichever is sooner, and as further set forth in this document.Expert Discovery due by 3/16/2012 or the later of 4 months after the Court's claim construction ruling. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/10/10) (cd)
December 13, 2010 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion To Transfer Venue with Declaration of James J. DeCarlo with supporting Exhibits 1-5 served on Martin B. Pavane on 12/13/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Bookbinder, Julie)
December 13, 2010 Filing 20 DECLARATION of James J. DeCarlo in Support re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Bookbinder, Julie)
December 13, 2010 Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Bookbinder, Julie)
December 6, 2010 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Naftali Shani)(Thompson, Roger)
November 19, 2010 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Supporting Declaration of James J. DeCarlo with Exhibits 1-22 and Declaration of Mark Bentley In Support of Motion to Tranfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) served on Martin B. Pavane on 11/18/10. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (DeCarlo, James)
November 18, 2010 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Mark Bentley in Support re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (DeCarlo, James)
November 18, 2010 Filing 15 DECLARATION of James J. DeCarlo in Support re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(DeCarlo, James)
November 18, 2010 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 13 MOTION to Transfer Case.. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (DeCarlo, James)
November 18, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case. Document filed by Apple Inc..(DeCarlo, James)
November 1, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/1/2010. Next Conference set for 12/22/2010 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (mro)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: By November 18, 2010, defendant shall either (a) advise the Court that it does not intend to make a venue or (b) file the venue motion. If filed, plaintiff shall respond by December 6 and defendants shall reply for December 13. The Court has advised the parties of the existence of one of its recent venue decisions which suggest that defendant's motion does not hold great promise. By December 10, 2010, the parties shall submit a revised case management plan along the lines discussed. Discovery may proceed during the hearing and deciding of the forum motion. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due in 14 days. By December 10, the parties shall advise whether they agree to retain a private mediator. The next Case Management Conference will be December 22, 2010 at 12:00 pm. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/1/2010) (jpo)
October 1, 2010 Filing 11 REPLY re: 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Thompson, Roger)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Roger S. Thompson dated 9/23/10 re: Request for an adjournment of the Initial Conference until 11/1/10. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 11/1/10 at 11:15 am from 10/15/10. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 11/1/2010 at 11:15 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/23/10) (db)
September 17, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott J. Bornstein on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Appearance of Scott J. Bornstein)(Bornstein, Scott)
September 13, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Pamela Bookbinder on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Bookbinder, Julie)
September 10, 2010 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Emblaze Ltd.. Document filed by Apple Inc..(DeCarlo, James)
September 10, 2010 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Apple Inc..(DeCarlo, James)
September 10, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Joseph DeCarlo on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(DeCarlo, James)
August 26, 2010 Filing 4 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from James J. DeCarlo dated 8/26/2010 re: Counsel for Defendant Apple, Inc. requests that the Defendant's deadline for filing its answer or otherwise responding to the complaint be extended until 9/10/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Apple Inc. answer due 9/10/2010. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2010) (tro)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/4/2010) (jmi)
July 29, 2010 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (rdz)
July 28, 2010 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Emblaze Ltd..(rdz)
July 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 910616)Document filed by Emblaze Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rdz)
July 28, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Inc.. (rdz)
July 28, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 28, 2010 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emblaze Ltd. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emblaze Ltd.
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Represented By: Martin Brian Pavane
Represented By: Kenneth L. Steinthal
Represented By: Roger S. Thompson
Represented By: Edward Murray Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Julie Pamela Bookbinder
Represented By: Scott J. Bornstein
Represented By: James Joseph DeCarlo
Represented By: Kenneth L. Steinthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?