Miller et al v. Security Life of Denver Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dara Miller and Darius Miller
Defendant: Security Life of Denver Insurance Company, ING America Equities Inc. and Southland Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv01175
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for 3/8/2013 is CONTINUED to 5/10/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying Motion to Sever (Dkt. No. 142). (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE Bench Trial is CONTINUED TO Tuesday 1/22/2013 8:30AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (fs, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 101 Aviva Life & Annunity Company's Motion to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court in amount of $377,630.92 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND [MODIFIED] ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DEADLINE re 96 Proposed Order, filed by Lawrence W. Krieger, Jr., Security Life of Denver Insurance Company, ING America Equities Inc., Darius Miller, Aviva Life and Annuity Company, Dara Miller Discovery due by 8/31/2012. Dispositive Motions heard by 10/30/2012.. Signed by Judge Yvlnne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting without leave to amend 77 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim; the Counterclaim is Dismissed with Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER; Referred to ADR for Private Mediation to occur by 6/29/12. Discovery due by 7/30/2012. Dispositive Motions heard by 9/25/12. Jury Selection set for 1/14/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Tr ial set for 1/14/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/17/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for 4/13/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 50 Motion for Order to Show Cause (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A CONTEMPT SANCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE TO GEORGE W. SHAEFFER (Dkt. No. 50). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012) (Main Document 60 replaced on 2/22/2012) (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 38 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENDING TIME FOR DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 45 Stipulation filed by Darius Miller, Dara Miller. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 20 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Stipulation filed by Security Life of Denver Insurance Company, ING America Equities Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Stipulation filed by Darius Miller, Dara Miller. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Security Life of Denver Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Miller
Represented By: Brian Patrick Villarreal
Represented By: John J. Bartko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Miller
Represented By: Brian Patrick Villarreal
Represented By: John J. Bartko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Life of Denver Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Represented By: Martin Elliot Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING America Equities Inc.
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Represented By: Martin Elliot Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?