Bonner v. Arastehjoo et al
Plaintiff: Charles A. Bonner
Defendant: Akram Arastehjoo and Neda Vojdani
Case Number: 4:2011cv01350
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 19 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' 30 REQUEST TO FILE ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE. Responses due by 9/20/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE 18 MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re 12 Default. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Arastehjoo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Bonner
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akram Arastehjoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neda Vojdani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?