O'Toole et al v. City of Antioch et al
Plaintiff: Sean O'Toole, Kelley O'Toole, Steven Daniel Lee, Jennifer Lynn Curtis and Jack Foster
Defendant: City of Antioch, Antioch Police Department, James Hyde, Norman Wielsch, Joshua Vincelet, James Wisecarver, Jr., Steven Aiello, Louis Lombardi and Steven Berherhouse
Case Number: 4:2011cv01502
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 235 Notice (Other), filed by Norman Wielsch. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/20/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER re dismissal of claims against Norman Wielsch. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/17/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER re request to prevent dismissal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/10/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER of dismissal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/2/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re trial exhibits and verdict form. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/30/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER re pretrial filings. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/15/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 138 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 165 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re chambers copies. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/25/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Discovery Order re: 120 & 123 Deposition of Christopher Butler. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/14/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Discovery Order re 120 Letter filed by Plaintiffs. Defendant shall file his portion of joint letter by 4/9/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 93 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 89 Motion (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Leave to File; granting 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Discovery Order re: 78 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding City of Antioch's Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/15/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re defendants' chambers copies. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/7/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY, Motions terminated: 62 MOTION to Compel filed by Kelley Barbara O'Toole, Steven Daniel Lee, Jennifer Lynn Curtis, Jack Foster, Sean O'Toole. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/17/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/12/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 57 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/11/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER lifting stay. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/24/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER striking 16 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/22/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Proposed Order filed by Steven Daniel Lee, Jennifer Lynn Curtis, Jack Foster, Sean O'Toole, Kelley O'Toole. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Toole et al v. City of Antioch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean O'Toole
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley O'Toole
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Daniel Lee
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Curtis
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Foster
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Department
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hyde
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Wielsch
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Vincelet
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wisecarver, Jr.
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Aiello
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Berherhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?