Gregory Village Partners, L.P. v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Village Partners, L.P.
Defendant: Central Contra Costa Sanitary District, Chevron U.S.A., Inc. and M.B. Enterprises
Case Number: 4:2011cv01597
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/25/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 65 Order on Motion to Dismiss, etc. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/20/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time Within Which Defedants are to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Central Contra Costa Sanitary District. Signed by Judge Phyllis Hamilton on 5/22/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 62 Stipulation filed by Gregory Village Partners, L.P. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET HEARING DATE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 60 Stipulation filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 58 Stipulation filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/16/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 44 Proposed Order filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Proposed Order filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Village Partners, L.P. v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Contra Costa Sanitary District
Represented By: Kenton Leigh Alm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B. Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Village Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Jordan S. Stanzler
Represented By: Jeffrey McCormick Curtiss
Represented By: Ruben A. Castellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?