Leitzke v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Leitzke
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The and Ron Gregorio
Case Number: 4:2011cv01617
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT re 38 Proposed Order filed by Thomas Leitzke. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/17/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulation Regarding Proposed Pre-Trial and Trial Dates filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. Discovery due by 3/23/2012. Motions to Augment the Record to be heard by 4/18/2012. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 6/13/2012. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (nah, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Stipulation, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitzke v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Leitzke
Represented By: James J Achermann
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Absalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Gregorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?