Chen v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Gang Chen
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv01668
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/31/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Stipulation Extending Expert Discovery Dates AS MODIFIED. Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2012. Rebuttal expert disclosures 3/15/2012. Expert discovery due 3/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/19/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/23/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation. Deadline continued from 11/11/2011 to 1/11/2012. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/09/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gang Chen
Represented By: Brian Joseph Bickel
Represented By: Amanda Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: William P. Buranich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?