Bennett et al v. Simplexgrinnell LP
Plaintiff: Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Dana R. Rendahl, Darren Scott and David A. Boecking
Defendant: Simplexgrinnell LP
Case Number: 4:2011cv01854
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 264 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 264 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Dana R. Rendahl, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER CONTINUING LITIGATION DEADLINES re 260 Notice, filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 236 Clerk's Notice, 235 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson Status Conference set for 9/23/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. September 16, 2014 Status Conference VACATED. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/16/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 227 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO ENFORCE A COURT ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Fourth Amended Complaint and Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Motions due by 6/20/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 204 MOTION Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 175 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Discovery, Motion Schedules, and Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson; 175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs Expert Report Deadline and Corresponding Schedule Changes filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF PATRICK NICASSIO filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Compel; terminating 163 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating 164 Discovery Letter Brief (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 129 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 129 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE; GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 112 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 119 Stipulation. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 109 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 113 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 114 Discovery Letter Brief (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 28, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DATES, MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER, AND RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY MOTION re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 100 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Data filed by Comerlis Delaney, David A . Boecking, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Discovery due by 6/28/2013. Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2013. Motions due by 10/17/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 70 Request for Judicial Notice.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 06/14/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER re 54 Stipulation filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying in Part and Granting in Part 39 Motion to Dismiss; Denying Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME re 19 Stipulation, filed by Comerlis Delaney, David A. Boecking, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Simplexgrinnell LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don C. Bennett
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerlis Delaney
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Robinson
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana R. Rendahl
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Scott
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Boecking
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplexgrinnell LP
Represented By: Dominick C Capozzola
Represented By: Carolyn Blecha Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?