Burgess v. eBay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Albert C. Burgess
Defendant: Mastercard International, Inc., eBay, Inc., Paypal, Inc., Google, Inc., Visa International, Inc., Danny L. Durham and Charlotte Observer Publishing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01898
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 74 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/20/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Amended Complaint due by 2/8/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/4/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; denying 49 Motion to Strike ; denying 49 Motion for Sanctions; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating 31 Motion ; granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 37 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. eBay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny L. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Observer Publishing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert C. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?