Trujillo v. Grounds
Plaintiff: Amado Reyes Trujillo
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Case Number: 4:2011cv01908
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Amado Reyes Trujillo, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/5/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PETITIONERS 31 MOTION TO EXPAND THE RECORD AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON ISSUE OF EQUITABLE TOLLING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 7 IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PETITIONER 2 AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO PAY THE FILING FEE OR FILE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; DENYING 3 APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; DIRECTING CLERK OF THE COURT TO SEND PETITIONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION FORM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amado Reyes Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?