Candler v. Santa Rita County Jail Watch Commander et al
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Candler
Defendant: Santa Rita County Jail Watch Commander and D. Sanchez
Case Number: 4:2011cv01992
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2022. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re Docket Nos. 117 and 118 . Brief due by 2/14/2020; Responses due by 3/6/2020 and Replies due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/31/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Discovery Order re: Docket No. 66 Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/4/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FORM. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candler v. Santa Rita County Jail Watch Commander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Candler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rita County Jail Watch Commander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?