J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Jernegan et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Dorothy King Jernegan, John Brown Jernegan and Everett & Jones Barbeque Jack London, LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv02095
Filed: April 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulation, filed by John Brown Jernegan, J & J Sports Productions Inc, Everett & Jones Barbeque Jack London, LLC, Dorothy King Jernegan. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/20/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Settlement Conference previously set on 4/9/2013 11:00 AM continued to 4/23/2013 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Settlement Conference filed by J & J Sports Productions Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/8/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 52 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2012 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/31/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/1/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Jernegan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy King Jernegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brown Jernegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett & Jones Barbeque Jack London, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?