Pacific Century International LTD v. Does 1-101

Plaintiff: Pacific Century International LTD
Defendant: Does 1-101
Case Number: 4:2011cv02533
Filed: May 25, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/29/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 13, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/13/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 5, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Response filed by Pacific Century International LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/05/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 15, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/15/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 27, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 22 Ex Parte Application.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 25, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
August 11, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 8 Motion to Amend/Correct.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 14, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/14/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 8, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 5 Ex Parte Application, and severing and dismissing Defendants without prejudice.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Century International LTD v. Does 1-101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Century International LTD
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?