Mitchell v. Duffy
Petitioner: Paul Mitchell
Respondent: Anthony Hedgpeth and CDCR-Salinas Valley State Prison
Case Number: 4:2011cv02705
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 45 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 26 Motion for Order to Show Cause (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 Letter filed by Paul Mitchell. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/15/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 26 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Paul Mitchell. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/23/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies Responses due by 1/12/2012. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Motions terminated: 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul Mitchell., ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CDCR-Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?