Jackson v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Jackson
Defendant: William Fischer, Jon Sabes, Steven Sabes, David Goldsteen, Marvin Siegel, Brian Campion, Lonnie Bookbinder, Chetan Narsude, Mani Koolasuriya, Joshua Rosen, Upper Orbit, LLC, Specigen, Inc., Peer Dreams Inc., NotebookzmInc., Ileonardo.com Inc., New Moon LLC, Monvia LLC and Sazani Beach Hotel
Case Number: 4:2011cv02753
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Discovery Order. In the attached order, the court orders the following. First, defense counsel must file his August 11 email to establish the record for his request. Second, Ms. Jackson's deposition must take place between August 29 and September 1. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/13/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER re 344 MOTION clarification Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification filed by Suzanne D. Jackson. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/10/16. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants in part and denies in part the discovery brief at ECF No. 335. The court orders the plaintiff to respond (as set forth in the order) no later than Friday, June 3, 2016, at 2 p.m. The court sets a case-management conference for Thursday, June 9, 2016, at 11 a.m. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER of referral re 322 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/14/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BRIAN CAMPION re 314 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Brian Campion, 316 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Marvin Siegel, Brian Campion, Steven Sabes, Jon Sabes. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/20/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 304 Motion for Reconsideration (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 275 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 275 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion to Dismiss; granting 277 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denyi ng in part 278 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 285 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; terminating 286 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; terminating 287 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/17/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 281 Motion (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 252 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion to Dismiss; granting 192 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/22/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/22/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 125 Motion to Dismiss; granting 127 Motion to Dismiss; granting 128 Motion to Dismiss; granting 137 Motion for Joinder and Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 148 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Upper Orbit, LLC filed by Suzanne D. Jackson. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/12/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER REMOVING MCMAHON SEREPCA LLP FROM THE DOCKET re 150 Notice (Other) filed by Upper Orbit, LLC, William Fischer. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/11/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Entering Default by the Court. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/24/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/24/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 104 Notice (Other) filed by Upper Orbit, LLC, William Fischer. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/18/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 122 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by New Moon LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/21/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/18/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Jackson
Represented By: Alan H. Kaufman
Represented By: Robert John Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fischer
Represented By: Katherine Anne Debski
Represented By: Peter Collins McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sabes
Represented By: Tanya Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sabes
Represented By: Tanya Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goldsteen
Represented By: Samuel Ryan Hellfeld
Represented By: Bret A. Huls
Represented By: Dianne L. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Siegel
Represented By: Tanya Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Campion
Represented By: John Stuart Claassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetan Narsude
Represented By: Chia Kai Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mani Koolasuriya
Represented By: Chia Kai Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rosen
Represented By: John Stuart Claassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Orbit, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Anne Debski
Represented By: Peter Collins McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specigen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peer Dreams Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NotebookzmInc.
Represented By: John Stuart Claassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ileonardo.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Moon LLC
Represented By: Chia Kai Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monvia LLC
Represented By: Chia Kai Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sazani Beach Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?