Blackmon et al v. Tobias
Plaintiff: James Blackmon and John Gray
Defendant: Jane Andreae, Enchanted Success, Glenn Tobias, Aldebarron Management Company, Infinity Entertainment Inc and Innerplay Entertainment
Case Number: 4:2011cv02853
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 139 Motion extension of 60 day conditional (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 136 Motion TO EXTEND CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER, Motions terminated: 132 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by James Blackmon, John Gray.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/5/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING 22 Plaintiff's Motion for a Writ of Attachment. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/30/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER VACATING April 5, 2012 Hearing and DENYING AS MOOT 102 Defendants' Administrative Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/29/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER (1) re: briefing schedule and telephonic hearing date for 83 85 Defendants' motions to withdraw and (2) CONTINUING hearing date on 22 Plaintiffs' motion for writ of attachment. See order for details. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/03/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 91 Order Referring Motion,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/17/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 79 Letter filed by James Blackmon, John Gray, 78 Letter Brief filed by Glenn Tobias. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler GRANTING 58 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Setting Hearing re 22 Motion for Writ of Attachment. Defendants Sur-Reply due by 09/30/11; Plaintiffs Sur-Reply due 10/07/11. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Writ of Attachment will be heard by this court on Thursday, 02/1612 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, Third Floor, United States District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, on 9/26/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement. Responses due by 9/16/2011. Replies due by 9/30/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Attachment and Temporary Restraining Order. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon et al v. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Andreae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enchanted Success
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldebarron Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Entertainment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innerplay Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blackmon
Represented By: David M. Given
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gray
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?