Raifman et al v. Wachovia Securities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC and Helicon Investments, Ltd.
Defendant: Wachovia Securities, LLC, George Gordon, III and Robert Eddy
Case Number: 4:2011cv02885
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 176 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 171 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re 165 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Reply Brief Page Limit filed by Bruce Cardinal, Susan Raifman, Gregory R. Raifman, Lorraine Kurata, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Edward Kurata, Jeffrey Chou, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, James Loomis. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 155 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, Wachovia Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 159 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 150 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying as moot 139 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 141 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 144 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; terminating 145 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Helicon Investments, Ltd. terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 131 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Cardinal, Helicon Investments, Ltd., Susan Raifman, Gregory R. Raifman, Lorraine Kurata, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Edward Kurata, Jeffrey Chou, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, James Loomis. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/27/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Wachovia Securities, LLC, Motions terminated: 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 118 Opposition/Response to Motion and re [105-1] Plaintiffs' Proposed Se cond Amended Complaint filed by Helicon Investments, Ltd., Susan Raifman, Gregory R. Raifman, Wachovia Securities, LLC, 103 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Helicon Investments, Ltd., Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 74 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 103 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Replies due by 3/1/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; terminating 115 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition re 103 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Helicon Investments, Ltd., Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LL C, Gregory R. Raifman, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition re 103 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , 103 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 2/22/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/25/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER, Attorney Thomas E. Alborg for Gekko Holdings, LLC,Thomas E. Alborg for Helicon Investments, Ltd.,Thomas E. Alborg for Gregory R. Raifman,Thomas E. Alborg for Susan Raifman added. Attorney Steven Jay Rood terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/13/12. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 73 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/14/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; terminating 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denied as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DISCOVERY ORDER re 64 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Replies due by 11/18/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 28 Motion MOTION TO CONSIDER LATE-FILED DECLARATION (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Stipulation, filed by Helicon Investments, Ltd., George Gordon, III, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Wachovia Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raifman et al v. Wachovia Securities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Raifman
Represented By: Mark J. Wilson
Represented By: Steven Jay Rood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Raifman
Represented By: Mark J. Wilson
Represented By: Steven Jay Rood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gekko Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven Jay Rood
Represented By: Mark J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helicon Investments, Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Jay Rood
Represented By: Mark J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Securities, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Roche
Represented By: Adam Joseph Rottenberg
Represented By: Ronald Eleger Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gordon, III
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Roche
Represented By: Adam Joseph Rottenberg
Represented By: Ronald Eleger Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?