Diacakis v. Comcast Corporation
Plaintiff: Athanassios Diacakis
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv03002
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2013. Discovery due by 1/17/2014. Motions due by 3/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2014 01:00 PM. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (1-2 day) set for 6/2/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/6/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER REOPENING ACTION AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2013 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Discovery Deadlines filed by Comcast Corporation, Athanassios Diacakis Discovery due by 8/2/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/24/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Discovery Deadlines filed by Comcast Corporation, Athanassios Diacakis Discovery due by 7/19/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/15/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 89 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Athanassios Diacakis. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 104 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE BRIEFING DEADLINES ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/30/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 41 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 3/12/2012. Replies due by 3/26/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/16/12. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR IN PERSON MEET AND CONFER. Discovery Hearing set for 12/2/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/23/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2011 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/11/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diacakis v. Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Michael P Daly
Represented By: Seamus C. Duffy
Represented By: Michael W. McTigue, Jr.
Represented By: Tara Sarosiek
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athanassios Diacakis
Represented By: John Peter Kristensen
Represented By: Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?