Carnahan v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Susan Carnahan
Defendant: The Shaw Group Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv03064
Filed: June 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 75 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Ryu FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/17/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to OPENING BRIEFS DUE BY 1/22/13. Responses due by 2/12/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 01:00 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 31 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/01/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER re 41 Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/26/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 32 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by Susan Carnahan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/3/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnahan v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shaw Group Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Carnahan
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?