U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Abercombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Abercombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03162
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/20/2013 10:00 AM. Counsel must appear in person. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to appear if documents finally resolving these cases are filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on 9/18/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2013 is CONTINUED TO Friday, 9/20/2013 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 FURTHER ORDER RE DEADLINES FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Motions in Limine which remain at issue filed by 10:00am on 9/9/2013. Oppositions filed by 9:00am on 9/12/2013. No reply papers are allowed. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 103 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PRETRIAL FILINGS TO SEPTEMBER 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS FILED AFTER SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND TERMINATING DKT. NO. 115 AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Plaintiffs' (combined) opening motion: 4/11/13; Defendants' Opposition/Cross-Motion due by 4/25/2013. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 5/9/2013; Defendants' Sur-Reply due 5/23/2013. Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/4/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 68 Motion for Sanctions (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING PRE-SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONFERENCE: Conference set for 2/27/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers re 81 , 78 Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/6/2013. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that defendants and third-party CAIR exchange the information as set forth herein re 79 JOINT NOTICE OF EFFORTS TO MEET AND CONFER, filed by Hollister Co. California, LLC, Council on American-Islamic Relations, California (CAIR-CA), Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/5/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/8/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 57 First Discovery Letter Brief regarding HR Contact Records filed by Umme-Hani Khan. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/14/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 37 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/21/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Abercombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Hollister Co. California, LLC. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/9/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Umme-Hani Khan. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/8/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Abercombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Jonathan T. Peck
Represented By: Marcia L. Mitchell
Represented By: William Robert Tamayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Amarra Autumn Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?