Tao et al v. Wu et al
Plaintiff: Minna Tao, Gabriel Li, Vicky Eng, Andrew Yan, Herman Wong, Ellen Chiu-yee, Wai-Hang Yeung, Debby Wu, Dora Lau, Tyler Livingston, Joel Beem, Raymond Tung, Regina Chan, Andrea Ho, Randel Hom, Simon Lee and Peter Sun
Defendant: Tommy Wu, Doreen Ho, Dennis Lee, Jonas Miller, Ebrahim Shabuddin, Burt Thompson and Viola Lucero
Case Number: 4:2011cv03248
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/31/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 83 Stipulation, filed by Dennis Lee, Viola Lucero, Burt Thompson, Jonas Miller. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/20/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/3/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in Part and Denying in Part 66 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 57 Stipulation,, filed by Andrea Ho, Ellen Chiu-yee, Vicky Eng, Gabriel Li, Joel Beem, Dora Lau, Tyler Livingston, Peter Sun, Simon Lee, Minna Tao, Regina Chan, Herman Wong, Wai-Hang Yeung, Raymond Tung, Andrew Yan, Debby Wu, Randel Hom. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tao et al v. Wu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minna Tao
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Li
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Eng
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Yan
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Wong
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Chiu-yee
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wai-Hang Yeung
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debby Wu
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Lau
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Represented By: Stacy North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Livingston
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Beem
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Tung
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Chan
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Ho
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randel Hom
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Lee
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sun
Represented By: Stacy North
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Lee
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Virginia H. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas Miller
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Virginia H. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebrahim Shabuddin
Represented By: Adrian G. Driscoll
Represented By: James Antone Lassart
Represented By: Spencer C. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Thompson
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Mikal J. Condon
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Claudia Angelica Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viola Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?