Frisco v. Midland Credit Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Louise Frisco
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc.
Mediator: Mary McLain
Case Number: 4:2011cv03284
Filed: July 5, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 11/30/2012 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 51 Motion to Continue (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 51 MOTION to Continue Discovery Cut-Off Deadline filed by Louise Frisco, 52 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Midland Credit Management Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 13, 2012. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER FOR LEAVE TO FILE RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER FOR LEAVE TO FILE RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Withdrawal of Strange & Carpenter as Co-counsel for Plaintiff filed by Louise Frisco, Attorney Brian Russell Strange; Gretchen Arlene Carpenter and John Peter Kristensen terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 35 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The 4/17/12 at 2:00pm hearing date is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to Defendant refiling the motion. Case Management Conference set 3/12/2012 at 2:00pm (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frisco v. Midland Credit Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Frisco
Represented By: Darin Shaw
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc.
Represented By: Robert Travis Campbell
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Mary McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?