craigslist, Inc v. Stover et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: John L Stover and Paradigm AMO Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv03308
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report, filed by craigslist, Inc., Paradigm AMO Corporation, John L Stover. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR, filed by craigslist, Inc (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by John L Stover, Paradigm AMO Corporation (Harouni, Kaivan) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2011 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 1 Complaint, filed by Craiglist, Inc., Paradigm AMO Corporation, John L Stover (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2011 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph M. McMillan (Filing fee $275, receipt number 4611007423) filed by Craiglist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 12 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2011 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
July 26, 2011 11 Amended Summons Issued as to John L Stover. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Craiglist, Inc as to John L Stover. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 9 Amended Summons Issued as to Paradigm AMO Corporation. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 19, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 7/19/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 7 TERMINATING 9/20/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 9/20/2011 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Craiglist, Inc and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 8, 2011 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 6, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to John L Stover. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 by Craiglist, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for: (1) Copyright Infringement (2) Violation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act; (3) Violation of the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act; (4) Violation of California Penal Code 502; (5) Trademark Infringement; (6) Trademark Infringement Under California Law; (7) Breach of Contract; (8) Inducing Breach of Contract; (9) Intentional Interference with Contractual Relations; (10) Fraud; and (11) Violations of California Business and Professionals Code (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Paradigm AMO Corporation, John L Stover ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611061844). Filed by Craiglist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit- A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: craigslist, Inc v. Stover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: Joseph Michael McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Stover
Represented By: Kaivan Harouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradigm AMO Corporation
Represented By: Kaivan Harouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?