Oracle Corporation et al v. ORG Structure Innovations LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oracle Corporation and Oracle America, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Morinville and ORG Structure Innovations LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv03549
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/5/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting (115) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:11-cv-03549-SBA; granting (47) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:12-cv-00297-SBA; granting (92) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:12-cv-00348-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (80 in 4:12-cv-00348-SBA, 80 in 4:12-cv-00348-SBA) Stipulation and Order, Case Referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting (104) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:11-cv-03549-SBA; granting (40) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:12-cv-00297-SBA; granting (81) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:12-cv-00348-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 94 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 66 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/24/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong EXTENDING the Briefing Deadlies as to 24 Motion to Dismiss, or Motion to Transfer Venue, 18 Motion to Dismiss or Motion to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 9/13/2011. Replies due by 9/27/2011. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 36 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER re 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Dkt. No. 1 filed by Paul Morinville. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/12/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle Corporation et al v. ORG Structure Innovations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Morinville
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: W. Bryan Farney
Represented By: Wayne M. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORG Structure Innovations LLC
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: W. Bryan Farney
Represented By: Wayne M. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Represented By: Peter J. O'Rourke
Represented By: Jie Li
Represented By: Korula T. Cherian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Korula T. Cherian
Represented By: Jie Li
Represented By: Peter J. O'Rourke
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?