Cuauhtemoc Meneses v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cuauhtemoc Meneses
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc. and U-Haul Co. of California
Case Number: 4:2011cv03615
Filed: July 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magsistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER, Motions terminated: 77 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Cuauhtemoc Meneses. Motions due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 7/30/2012. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/12. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/12 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/25/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 72 Motion Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/29/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 36 Motion to Amend/Correct.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2011 11:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/30/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Cuauhtemoc Meneses. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/22/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Vacating Date for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Setting New Hearing Date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/9/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011) Modified on 11/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/8/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuauhtemoc Meneses v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuauhtemoc Meneses
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T McCoy
Represented By: James Robert Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul Co. of California
Represented By: James Robert Evans, Jr
Represented By: Ryan T McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?