J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Bracamontes et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Doroteo Meza Bracamontes and Martin Meza Gonzales
Case Number: 4:2011cv03713
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of J&J Sports Productions, Inc. against Doroteo Meza Bracamontes, Martin Meza Gonzales, in amount of $2,400.00. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/20/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CORRECTING SIGNATURE re 30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 3/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without Prejudice and with Leave to Amend 17 Motion for Default Judgment; terminating 22 Report and Recommendations; granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Objections. Within 14 days of the date t his Order is filed Plaintiff may file an Amended Motion for Default Judgment; that Motion is REFERRED back to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for Report and Recommendation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (fs, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE.Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. Said Motion is REFERRED to the Chief Magistrate Judge or her designee for a report and recommendat ion. If no objection has been filed in response to the report and recommendation within the applicable deadline,Plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing that the report and recommendation has been issued and that no objections have been received. Compliance Conference set for 3/2/2012 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in a designated courtroom in the Oakland Courthouse.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/24/2012.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Bracamontes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doroteo Meza Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Meza Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?