Hard Drive Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-33
Plaintiff: Hard Drive Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-33
Case Number: 4:2011cv03827
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER regarding 25 September 10, 2012 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter Brief. The court QUASHES the deposition subpoena that Hard Drive served on Mr. McClain. Hard Drive, however, may serve another one on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/5/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Serve ISP Subscriber with a Deposition Subpoena. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 05/24/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Appear by Telephone at the May 24, 2012 Initial Case Management Conference. Should Plaintiff wish to do so, it shall contact Courtroom Deputy Lashanda Scott at (415) 522-3140 by Wednesday, May 23, 2012 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/22/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery. The court grants Plaintiff's motion with respect to Doe No. 1, and it severs Does 2-33 and dismisses Plaintiff's claims against them. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/3/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hard Drive Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-33
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hard Drive Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-33
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?