Wolk et al v. Verizon California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Wolk and Barbara Wolk
Defendant: Verizon California, Inc. and Enhanced Services Billing Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03916
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/26/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/25/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/24/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 10 Motion to Transfer (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolk et al v. Verizon California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wolk
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Suzanne Beckman
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Wolk
Represented By: Suzanne Beckman
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Services Billing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?