Clem v. Barneys New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oksana Clem
Defendant: Barneys New York, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03952
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 38 COUNSELS REQUEST TO WITHDRAW. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION AND THE PARTIES OVERDUE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING 26 EX PARTE APPLICATION RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/15/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clem v. Barneys New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oksana Clem
Represented By: Alden Jay Knisbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barneys New York, Inc.
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Represented By: Susan L Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?