Marroquin v. Cate
Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Marroquin
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Case Number: 4:2011cv04535
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Armando Antonio Marroquin Amended Complaint due by 3/7/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER re 6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Armando Antonio Marroquin, 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Armando Antonio Marroquin. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marroquin v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?