United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Paron Capital Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Paron Capital Management, LLC and James D. Crombie
Case Number: 4:2011cv04577
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 7:6
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REGARDING 276 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF CFTCS 268 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION,RESTITUTION, AND IMPOSITION OF CIVIL MONETARY PENALTIES AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMES D.CROMBIE***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/21/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER GRANTING THE USCFTCS 234 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING CROMBIES 252 CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING CROMBIES ( 191 , 194 ) MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE NEW COUNTERCLAIMS AND THIRD-PARTY CLAIMS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE, TO COMPEL, AND TO EXTEND DISCOVERY re 165 Request for Judicial Notice filed by James Devlin Crombie, 162 MOTION to Compel Paron, extend discovery and for magistrate judge to recuse filed by James Dev lin Crombie, 166 Exhibits, filed by James Devlin Crombie, 173 Statement filed by James Devlin Crombie, 164 Letter Brief, filed by James Devlin Crombie, 163 MOTION to Compel, extend discovery and for magistrate judge to recuse filed by James Devlin Crombie, 175 Proposed Order, filed by James Devlin Crombie. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/5/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER ADDRESSING VARIOUS MATTERS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/12/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 189 Stipulation of Permanent Injunction Under the Commodity Exchange Act Against Defendant Paron Capital Management, LLC. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING CROMBIE'S REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE 160 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/6/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE 158 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/27/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 137 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING REQUESTS RE: THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 151 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/19/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DENYING REQUEST WITHOUT PREJUDICE 143 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/7/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REFERRING Litigant James D. Crombie to Federal Pro Bono Project for Appointment of Counsel for the limited purpose of representing litigant in the course of settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/1/2012. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY FROM MCCONNON AND LYONS RE: 98 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/9/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: 114 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/5/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012) Modified on 4/5/2012 (nclc1, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 95 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF JAMES D. CROMBIE LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY AND VACATING HEARING. 82 MOTION to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/22/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken is vacated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DEPOSITIONS 88 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/29/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANT JAMES D. CROMBIES 42 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE 77 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/16/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE RE: 77 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/9/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: 74 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/26/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation Extending the Deadline for Defendant Paron Capital Management, LLC to Respond to the Complaint. Admissions due by 2/16/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/11/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Quashing Requests for Interrogatories and Admissions and Setting Limitations on Discovery. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/20/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference Re: 52 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/13/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to extend time to file an answer. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation EXTENDING DEFENDANT PARON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Paron Capital Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Tara Robinson Kelly
Represented By: John Charles Einstman
Represented By: Brian George Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paron Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Mark Philip Fickes
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Crombie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?