Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. South City Ford, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, James H. Beno, Bill Brunelli, Stephen J. Mack, Chris Christophersen, Don Crosatto, Mark Hollibush, Jon Roselle, Doug Cornford and James V. Canterbury
Defendant: South City Ford, Inc., David J. Gonzalez and Florida Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2011cv04590
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 70 REQUEST FOR STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 58 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANT SOUTH CITY MOTORS, INC.'S 33 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 29 MOTION TO STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/23/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation Selecting Mediation.ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. South City Ford, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Beno
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brunelli
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Mack
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Crosatto
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hollibush
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Roselle
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Cornford
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V. Canterbury
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South City Ford, Inc.
Represented By: Merrill G. Emerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Gonzalez
Represented By: Merrill G. Emerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Gonzalez
Represented By: Merrill G. Emerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?