Mikich et al v. County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Charles Mikich and Alexis Mikich
Defendant: County of San Francisco, Bonnie Dickerson, Dan Phillips and Brandi Woolery
Case Number: 4:2011cv04629
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DISMISSING CASE in its entirety with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this court, within 120 days, with proof of service of a copy thereon to opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this case shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/4/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint status report within 60 days of this order. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/5/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Vacating All Pending Case Deadlines re 104 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M.Ryu on 10/01/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying 98 Motion to Excuse parties from attending Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 81 Motion to Amend/Correct.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 68 Motion and continuing Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 55 Statement filed by Dan Phillips, Bonnie Dickerson, County of San Francisco, Alexis Mikich, Charles Mikich, 56 Declaration in Support, filed by Dan Phillips, Bonnie Dickerson, County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/17/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 45 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dan Phillips, Bonnie Dickerson, County of San Francisco, Alexis Mikich, Brandi Woolery, Charles Mikich Discovery Hearing set for 1/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/9/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 42 Letter filed by Dan Phillips, Bonnie Dickerson, County of San Francisco, Alexis Mikich, Brandi Woolery, Charles Mikich. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 39 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re: Motion to Compel filed by Charles Mikich Discovery Hearing set for 10/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/10/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikich et al v. County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mikich
Represented By: Dennis R. Ingols
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett ONeill Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Mikich
Represented By: Dennis R. Ingols
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Brett ONeill Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Francisco
Represented By: Donald Paul Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Dickerson
Represented By: Donald Paul Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Phillips
Represented By: Donald Paul Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Woolery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?