Affiliated FM Insurance Company v. Earthquake Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Defendant: Earthquake Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv04925
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/11/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 40 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Earthquake Enterprises, Inc. Discovery Hearing set for 10/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/10/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 33 Letter filed by Earthquake Enterprises, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/01/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REQUIRING DEMAND AND RESPONSE AND MEET-AND-CONFER ABOUT TIMING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF PENDING DISCOVERY REQUEST RE TESTING OF GLUE (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER regarding 32 34 35 certain non-parties' participation in the October 2, 2012 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/27/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 32 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/25/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/15/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affiliated FM Insurance Company v. Earthquake Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthquake Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward P. Murphy
Represented By: G. Edward Rudloff,, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?