Scott v. Florence Crittenton Services
Plaintiff: Shawn C. Scott
Defendant: Florence Crittenton Services
Case Number: 4:2011cv05050
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION filed by Florence Crittenton Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/21/12. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION- WITH SIGNATURE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/30/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/25/2012. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 18 Stipulation For Continuance of Mediation Completion Date.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Florence Crittenton Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn C. Scott
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Crittenton Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?