Sonics, Inc. v. Arteris, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonics, Inc.
Defendant: Arteris, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv05311
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/27/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Frederick Jeu terminated (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: C-11-5311-SBA; C-12-434-SBA by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Cases associated. Consolidated Amended Complaint due by 7/17/2013. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 06/17/13. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 58 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 73 Motion for Reconsideration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Claim Construction Statement filed by Arteris, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/21/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 32 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/1/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2012 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/7/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduled Mediation filed by Sonics, Inc., Arteris, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/30/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonics, Inc. v. Arteris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Kryston
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole VanVoorhis
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arteris, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Chang Up Kim
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Gerald Takashi Sekimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?