Brown v. FPI Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashanna Brown
Defendant: Kennedy Wilson, Inc. and FPI Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv05414
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONFERENCE Pre-Filing Conference re Motions for Summary Judgment is set for Tuesday, January 22, 2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/16/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013) Modified on 1/16/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 58 Letter filed by FPI Management, Inc.. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 1/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gozalez Rogers on 1/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 54 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 54 Second Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ashanna Brown, FPI Management, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/17/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for 12/14/2012 is CONTINUED to Friday, 1/11/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ashanna Brown, Kennedy-Wilson Holdings, Inc., FPI Management, Inc., Kennedy-Wilson, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASEMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/5/2012 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2012. Case Management Conference continued to 11/5/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/27/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. FPI Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Wilson, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPI Management, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Lee Diesch
Represented By: James Milton Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashanna Brown
Represented By: Spencer Freeman Smith
Represented By: Dow Wakefield Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?