Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Clifton Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Central California Pipe Trades Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Clifton Enterprises Inc., Barbara Anna Clifton, Charles Lee Clifton, Sr., Robert Lawrence Clifton and American Contractors Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv05447
Filed: November 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS CLAIMS SUBJECT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL SCHEDULE re 98 : Status Conference set for 6/18/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/30/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/13/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/23/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Clifton Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Central California Pipe Trades Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Anna Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lee Clifton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lawrence Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert John Stroj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?