Simi Management Corporation v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Simi Management Corporation
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv05573
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of Docket 95 , the pretrial conference previously set for May 15, 2013 is hereby VACATED. The parties are ordered to file a status report by May 25, 2013, unless a dismissal is filed before then. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/13/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER . A minute entry issued by Judge Corley dated April 16, 2013 indicated that the parties havesettled. [Docket No. 93.] However, the pretrial conference remains set for May 15, 2013 before thiscourt. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status statement by May 13, 2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 69 Motion to Strike. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/15/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 81 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 47 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 Stipulation, filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. Replies due by 1/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/14/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 47 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Simi Management Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 11:00 AM. Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/4/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/30/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simi Management Corporation v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simi Management Corporation
Represented By: Laura Michelle Mooney
Represented By: William Arthur Logan, Jr.
Represented By: Donald J. Putterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Wendlenner
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?