Monterey County Bank v. Bancinsure, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monterey County Bank
Defendant: Bancinsure, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv06171
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Stipulation 37 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/2/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING.Compliance Hearing is set for 5/24/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/4/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing Monterey County Bank to provide an updated demand to BancInsure no later than Monday, March 25, 2013, at 4 p.m., and BancInsure to reply no later than Tuesday, March 26, 2013, at 4 p.m. (with an email at the same time to the court's orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/23/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY**** AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference to occur at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 15th Floor, Courtroom C, San Francisco, CA 94102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/20/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/20/2013 (ls, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRE-FILING CONFERENCE for Friday, 3/15/13 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers re 26 TO EXTEND DATES FOR DISCOVERY CUTOFF, EXPERT DISCLOSURES, AND EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER Referred to ADR for Mandatory Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge to occur by 4/5/13.Expert Discovery due by 3/12/2013. Dispositive Motions heard by 5/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/201 3 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/8/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 7/8/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey County Bank v. Bancinsure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey County Bank
Represented By: Gerard Anthony Rose
Represented By: David John Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bancinsure, Inc.
Represented By: David Billings
Represented By: David Taylor DiBiase, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?