CLiC Goggles, Inc. v. Gugyela et al
Plaintiff: CLiC Goggles, Inc.
Defendant: Isabel Gugyela
Case Number: 4:2011cv06369
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/7/2013 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/7/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/20/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLiC Goggles, Inc. v. Gugyela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Gugyela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLiC Goggles, Inc.
Represented By: Miles Archer Woodlief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?