Tidwell v. U.S. Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Program et al
Plaintiff: Arthur R. Tidwell
Defendant: Department of Navy Naval FAC ENG CMD-Stations & Bases HRO-Navy Region Southwest, U.S. Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Program and Alexis Lara
Case Number: 4:2011cv06393
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/15/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/6/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/22/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. U.S. Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Navy Naval FAC ENG CMD-Stations & Bases HRO-Navy Region Southwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur R. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?