Western National Life Insurance Company v. Woldemariam et al
Plaintiff: Western National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Roma Woldemariam and Yohannes Russom Weldemichael
Case Number: 4:2011cv06668
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REGARDING DECLARATION OF ROGER L. MEREDITH IN RESPONSE TO UNFILED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/20/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONFIRMING SET ASIDE OF DEFAULT Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT re 37 Order.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western National Life Insurance Company v. Woldemariam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roma Woldemariam
Represented By: Ioana Mondescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yohannes Russom Weldemichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Represented By: Michael K. Brisbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?